EP1372577 - SELF-FOAMING OR FOAMY PREPARATIONS COMPRISING PARTICULATE HYDROPHOBIC AND/OR HYDROPHOBIZED AND/OR OIL-ABSORBENT SOLID SUBSTANCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.04.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.05.2006 [2006/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beiersdorf AG Unnastrasse 48 20245 Hamburg / DE | [2004/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLECKMANN, Andreas Richard-Dehmel-Strasse 33 22926 Ahrensburg / DE | 02 /
KRÖPKE, Rainer Achtern Diek 23 22869 Schenefeld / DE | 03 /
RIEDEL, Heidi Lokstedter Steindamm 24 22529 Hamburg / DE | [2004/01] | Application number, filing date | 02722219.9 | 14.03.2002 | [2004/01] | WO2002EP02852 | Priority number, date | DE2001113048 | 15.03.2001 Original published format: DE 10113048 | [2004/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02074256 | Date: | 26.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1372577 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/00, A61K7/06, A61K7/48 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
A61K8/046 (EP,US);
A61K8/342 (EP,US);
A61K8/361 (EP,US);
A61K8/39 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61Q1/02 (EP,US);
A61Q17/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/01] | Title | German: | SELBSTSCHÄUMENDE ODER SCHAUMFÖRMIGE ZUBEREITUNGEN MIT PARTIKULÄREN HYDROPHOBEN UND/ODER HYDROPHOBISIERTEN UND/ODER ÖLABSORBIERENDEN FESTKÖRPERSUBSTANZEN | [2004/01] | English: | SELF-FOAMING OR FOAMY PREPARATIONS COMPRISING PARTICULATE HYDROPHOBIC AND/OR HYDROPHOBIZED AND/OR OIL-ABSORBENT SOLID SUBSTANCES | [2004/01] | French: | PREPARATIONS MOUSSANTES OU MOUSSEUSES COMPRENANT DES SUBSTANCES SOLIDES PARTICULAIRES HYDROPHOBES ET/OU RENDUES HYDROPHOBES ET/OU D'ABSORPTION D'HUILE | [2004/01] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 27.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/22] | 12.12.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [E]EP1216684 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [E] 1-11 * example 4 *; | [X]EP1046387 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1-11 * claims 1,5,6 * * paragraphs [0009] , [0030] , [0031] , [0034] * * paragraphs [0004] - [0007] *; | [A]DE3628531 (MERZ & CO GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-11 * example - *; | [A]US4778674 (GUPTE ANIL J [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * claim - * |