EP1402530 - SIGNAL PROCESSOR AND APPARATUS FOR REPRODUCING INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2005 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.12.2005 [2005/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/14] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POZIDIS, Charalampos Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
COENE, Willem, M., J., M. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
BERGMANS, Johannes, W., M. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2004/14] | Representative(s) | Deguelle, Wilhelmus H. G. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/14] | Deguelle, Wilhelmus Hendrikus Gerardus Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 02722628.1 | 24.04.2002 | [2004/14] | WO2002IB01484 | Priority number, date | EP20010201710 | 10.05.2001 Original published format: EP 01201710 | [2004/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02091378 | Date: | 14.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1402530 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/14 | [2004/14] | CPC: |
G11B20/1426 (EP,US);
G11B20/10 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/14] | Title | German: | SIGNALSPROZESSOR UND -GERÄT ZUR INFORMATIONSWIEDERGABE | [2004/14] | English: | SIGNAL PROCESSOR AND APPARATUS FOR REPRODUCING INFORMATION | [2004/14] | French: | UNITE DE TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAUX ET APPAREIL DE REPRODUCTION D'INFORMATIONS | [2004/14] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/14] | 03.11.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0821360 (SONY CORP [JP]) [DA] 1-5,7 * page 2, line 43 - line 56 * * page 3, line 22 - line 43 * * page 4, line 10 - line 12 * * page 7, line 11 - line 13 * * page 19, line 10 - line 16 * * page 22, line 5 - line 46 * * figures 3,11 *; | [A]US5444680 (UMEZAWA MASARU [JP], et al) [A] 1,7 * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 9 * * column 2, line 36 - line 53 * * column 3, line 23 - column 4, line 63 * |