EP1387334 - DISPLAY MODULE AND DISPLAY UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 2-5-5, Keihan-Hondori Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570-0083 / JP | For all designated states Tottori Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 201 Minamiyoshikata 3-chome Tottori-shi, Tottori-ken 680-8634 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/06] | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 2-5-5, Keihan-Hondori Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570-0083 / JP | ||
For all designated states Tottori Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 201 Minamiyoshikata 3-chome Tottori-shi, Tottori-ken 680-8634 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIO, Toshiya, Tottori Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd 201, Minamiyoshikata 3-chome Tottori-shi, Tottori 680-8634 / JP | 02 /
YAMANE, Seiji, Tottori Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd 201, Minamiyoshikata 3-chome Tottori-shi, Tottori 680 -8634 / JP | [2004/06] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/06] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02722883.2 | 26.04.2002 | [2004/06] | WO2002JP04299 | Priority number, date | JP20010138797 | 09.05.2001 Original published format: JP 2001138797 | JP20010140410 | 10.05.2001 Original published format: JP 2001140410 | [2004/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02091340 | Date: | 14.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1387334 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.11.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G09F9/00, G02F1/13, G02F1/1345, H04N5/66, G06F1/16, H05K5/02, H05K7/14, H05K9/00 | [2006/42] | CPC: |
G02F1/133308 (EP,US);
G02F1/1333 (KR);
G06F1/1601 (EP,US);
G02F1/133305 (EP,US);
G02F1/133322 (EP,US);
G02F1/133334 (EP,US);
G02F1/133602 (EP,US);
G02F1/13452 (EP,US);
G06F2200/1612 (EP,US);
H01J2211/446 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/06] | G09F9/00, G02F1/1345, H04N5/66, G06F1/16, H05K5/02, H05K7/14, H05K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/06] | Title | German: | ANZEIGEMODUL UND ANZEIGEEINHEIT | [2004/06] | English: | DISPLAY MODULE AND DISPLAY UNIT | [2004/06] | French: | MODULE ET UNITE D'AFFICHAGE | [2004/06] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2003 | Translation filed | 27.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2003 | Search fee paid | 27.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 27.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/06] | 25.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 07.12.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5432626 (SASUGA MASUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-5* column 17, line 50 - column 26, line 30; compounds 23-39 * | International search | [X]JPH0550428U |