EP1364427 - HIGH-FREQUENCY DIPLEXER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.03.2005 [2005/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Axe, Inc. 200 MetroWest Technology Dive Maynard, MA 01754 / US | [2003/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERGHESE, Simon 11 Elwern Road Arlington, MA 02474 / US | [2003/48] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Robert Patrick Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/48] | Jackson, Robert Patrick Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 02723257.8 | 19.02.2002 | [2003/48] | WO2002US05987 | Priority number, date | US20010270055P | 20.02.2001 Original published format: US 270055 P | [2003/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02067367 | Date: | 29.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1364427 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01P5/16 | [2003/48] | CPC: |
H01P1/2135 (EP,US);
H01P5/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHFREQUENZDIPLEXER | [2003/48] | English: | HIGH-FREQUENCY DIPLEXER | [2003/48] | French: | DIPLEXEUR HAUTE FREQUENCE | [2003/48] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.09.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/48] | 01.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/13] | 19.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5606286 (BAINS DEVENDAR S [US]) [A] 1,18,25 * column 6, lines 34-41 * * column 12, lines 15-31; figure 1 *; | [A]US5032804 (HOLLINGSWORTH ALLEN H [US]) [A] 1,18,25 * column 3, lines 63-66 * * column 4, lines 25-43; figure 1 *; | [A]US3748600 (SMITH J, et al) [A] 1,18,25 * column 1, lines 8-32 * * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 15; figure 1 *; | [A]DE3624176 (ROHDE & SCHWARZ [DE]) [A] 1,18,25 * the whole document * | [A] - NESIMOGLU T ET AL, "SECOND HARMONIC ZONE INJECTION FOR AMPLIFIER LINEARISATION", 1999 IEEE 49TH. VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE. HOUSTON, TX, MAY 16 - 20, 1999, IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, NY: IEEE, US, (19990516), vol. 3 CONF. 49, ISBN 0-7803-5566-0, pages 2353 - 2357, XP000936232 [A] 1,18,25 * page 2354, column R, lines 19-21; figure 2 * |