EP1385606 - APPARATUS AND PROCESS FOR ENHANCED FEED ATOMIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.09.2010 [2010/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company 1545 Route 22 East P.O. Box 900 Annandale, NJ 08801-0900 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/06] | For all designated states ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company 1545 Route 22 East, P.O. Box 900 Annandale, NJ 08801-0900 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADAMSON, William, Russell 6033 Pine Hollow Court Baton Rouge, LA 70817 / US | 02 /
SWAN, George, Alexander, III 18437 Wildlife Way Drive Baton Rouge, LA 70817 / US | 03 /
BEDELL, Michael, Walter 245 Meadow Bend Drive Baton Rouge, LA 70820 / US | [2004/15] |
Former [2004/06] | 01 /
ADAMSON, William, Russell 2510 Gates Circle 21 Baton Rouge, LA 70809 / US | ||
02 /
SWAN, George, Alexander, III 18437 Wildlife Way Drive Baton Rouge, LA 70817 / US | |||
03 /
BEDELL, Michael, Walter 245 Meadow Bend Drive Baton Rouge, LA 70820 / US | Representative(s) | Dew, Melvyn John ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/06] | Dew, Melvyn John ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. Intellectual Property Shared Services P.O. Box 105 1830 Machelen / BE | Application number, filing date | 02723795.7 | 09.04.2002 | [2004/06] | WO2002US10977 | Priority number, date | US20010285027P | 19.04.2001 Original published format: US 285027 P | US20020113614 | 01.04.2002 Original published format: US 113614 | [2004/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02085501 | Date: | 31.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1385606 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.10.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B01F3/02 | [2004/06] | CPC: |
B01J19/26 (EP,US);
B01F23/2132 (EP,US);
B01F25/3131 (EP,US);
B01F25/31331 (EP,US);
B01F25/3141 (EP,US);
B01F25/433 (EP,US);
B01F25/4331 (EP,US);
B01F33/834 (EP,US);
B01F35/715 (EP,US);
B01J4/002 (EP,US);
B01J8/1827 (EP,US);
B05B7/0491 (EP,US);
C10G11/18 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERTEN EINSATZZERSTÄUBUNG | [2004/06] | English: | APPARATUS AND PROCESS FOR ENHANCED FEED ATOMIZATION | [2004/06] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE POUR ATOMISATION D'ALIMENTATION AMELIOREE | [2004/06] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2003 | Search fee paid | 04.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.11.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/06] | 30.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/35] | 13.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4498786 (RUSCHEWEYH HANS [DE]) [X] 2-4* figures 5,9,15 *; | [X]US4578183 (CHOU TAI-SHENG [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-10,12-19 * column 4, line 49 - column 5, line 49; figure 2 *; | [X]EP0205739 (BABCOCK WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1,3 * page 3, line 22 - page 4, line 9; figure 3 *; | [XA]WO0114500 (EXXONMOBIL RES & ENG CO [US]) [X] 2,3,5-10,12-20 * page 12, line 3 - page 15, line 5; figures 1-3 * * page 22, line 5 - page 23, paragraph 1; figure 4 * [A] 1 | International search | [YP]US6358483 (TROTT LOUIS ROCCO [US], et al); | [Y]US6093310 (SWAN GEORGE A [US]); | [A]US5173175 (STEFFENS TODD R [US], et al) |