EP1384057 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CRYOEMBEDDING OF SAMPLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.09.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Peters, Steven Department of Patology, 30 Prospect Avenue, Hackensack University Hospital Hackensack, NJ 07601 / US | [2004/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/05] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Christian Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/05] | Schmidt, Christian, Dipl.-Phys. Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR, Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02723829.4 | 11.04.2002 | [2004/05] | WO2002US11435 | Priority number, date | US20010848152 | 03.05.2001 Original published format: US 848152 | [2004/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02090938 | Date: | 14.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1384057 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.11.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/42 | [2007/10] | CPC: |
G01N1/42 (EP,US);
G01N1/36 (EP,US);
Y10T436/25 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/05] | G01N1/30, G01N33/48 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR GEFRIEREINBETTUNG VON PROBEN | [2004/05] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CRYOEMBEDDING OF SAMPLES | [2004/05] | French: | APPAREIL ET METHODE DE CRYOINCLUSION D'ECHANTILLONS | [2004/05] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2003 | Search fee paid | 31.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 31.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/05] | 24.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/44] | 10.06.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3204424 (MCCORMICK JAMES B, et al) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US3319289 (MCCORMICK JAMES B) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4745764 (SITTE HELLMUTH [AT], et al) [A] 1-42,59-66 * the whole document *; | [A]US4752347 (RADA DAVID C [US]) [A] 1,59 * column 5, line 19 - column 9, line 20; figures 1-9 *; | [A]US4865871 (LIVESEY STEPHEN A [US], et al) [A] 1,59 * column 17, lines 6-64; figure 5 *; | [A]US5628197 (RADA DAVID C [US]) [A] 1,59 * the whole document *; | [A]US5983991 (FRANKS JAMES W [US]) [A] 1-42,59-66 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US4840035 (LIBERMAN BARNET L [US]); | [A]US4865871 (LIVESEY STEPHEN A [US], et al) |