EP1390548 - CELLS FOR DETECTION OF ENTEROVIRUSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS OF CLEVELAND 11100 Euclid Avenue Cleveland Ohio 44106 / US | [2011/21] |
Former [2005/09] | For all designated states University Hospitals of Cleveland 11100 Euclid Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44106 / US | ||
Former [2004/09] | For all designated states Diagnostic Hybrids, Inc. 350 West state street Athens, OH 45701 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Yung, T. 4890 Lindsey Lane Richmond Heights, OH 44143 / US | [2004/09] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/09] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 02723956.5 | 24.04.2002 | [2004/09] | WO2002US12937 | Priority number, date | US20010844311 | 27.04.2001 Original published format: US 844311 | [2004/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02087499 | Date: | 07.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1390548 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1390548 | Date: | 25.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/70, G01N33/53, C12P1/00, C12P5/02 | [2004/09] | CPC: |
C12N5/0686 (EP,US);
C07K14/70596 (EP,US);
C12N7/00 (EP,US);
G01N33/56983 (EP,US);
C12N2503/00 (EP,US);
C12N2510/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/09] | Extension states | AL | 18.11.2003 | LT | 18.11.2003 | LV | 18.11.2003 | MK | 18.11.2003 | RO | 18.11.2003 | SI | 18.11.2003 | Title | German: | ZELLEN ZUM NACHWEIS VON ENTEROVIREN | [2004/09] | English: | CELLS FOR DETECTION OF ENTEROVIRUSES | [2004/09] | French: | CELLULES POUR LA DETECTION D'ENTEROVIRUS | [2004/09] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2003 | Search fee paid | 18.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/09] | 16.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.02.2009 | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.05.2011 | BE | 25.05.2011 | CY | 25.05.2011 | DK | 25.05.2011 | FI | 25.05.2011 | IT | 25.05.2011 | NL | 25.05.2011 | SE | 25.05.2011 | TR | 25.05.2011 | GR | 26.08.2011 | ES | 05.09.2011 | PT | 26.09.2011 | [2014/21] |
Former [2012/23] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
IT | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
BE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
NL | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
FI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
ES | 05.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | PT | 26.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [PX] - HUANG YUNG T ET AL, "Engineered BGMK cells for sensitive and rapid detection of enteroviruses.", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY. FEB 2002, (200202), vol. 40, no. 2, ISSN 0095-1137, pages 366 - 371, XP002312890 [PX] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JCM.40.2.366-371.2002 | [T] - BUCK GEORGE E ET AL, "Comparison of mixed cell culture containing genetically engineered BGMK and CaCo-2 cells (Super E-Mix) with RT-PCR and conventional cell culture for the diagnosis of enterovirus meningitis.", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL VIROLOGY : THE OFFICIAL PUBLICATION OF THE PAN AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR CLINICAL VIROLOGY. JUL 2002, (200207), vol. 25 Suppl 1, ISSN 1386-6532, pages S13 - S18, XP002312891 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1386-6532(02)00029-X | International search | [Y]US6168915 (SCHOLL DAVID R [US], et al); | [Y] - POWELL ET AL., "Characterization of echoviruses that bind decay accelerating factor (CD55): evidence that some haemagglutinating strains use more than one cellular receptor", JOURNAL OF GENERAL VIROLOGY, (1998), vol. 79, pages 1707 - 1713, XP002964573 | by applicant | US6168915 | - POWELL,, R. M., JOURNAL OF GENERAL VIROLOGY, (1998), vol. 79, pages 1707 - 1713 |