EP1371122 - ELECTRICAL SWITCHGEAR COMPRISING A VENTILATION DEVICE AND VENTILATION DEVICE COMPRISING TWO VENTILATION ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.03.2010 [2010/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/51] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EISELT, Martin Philippistrasse 2 14059 Berlin / DE | 02 /
MAHN, Gildo Am Schaftrieb 22 63589 Linsengericht / DE | 03 /
MILBICH, Achim Schützenstrasse 33 68753 Waghäusel / DE | [2003/51] | Application number, filing date | 02724106.6 | 11.03.2002 | [2003/51] | WO2002DE00934 | Priority number, date | DE2001114743 | 20.03.2001 Original published format: DE 10114743 | [2003/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02075885 | Date: | 26.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1371122 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H02B13/025 | [2003/51] | CPC: |
H02B13/025 (EP,US);
H02B1/56 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/51] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE SCHALTANLAGE MIT EINER LÜFTUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND LÜFTUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT ZWEI LÜFTUNGSELEMENTEN | [2003/51] | English: | ELECTRICAL SWITCHGEAR COMPRISING A VENTILATION DEVICE AND VENTILATION DEVICE COMPRISING TWO VENTILATION ELEMENTS | [2003/51] | French: | INSTALLATION DE DISTRIBUTION ELECTRIQUE MUNIE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE VENTILATION ET DISPOSITIF DE VENTILATION CORRESPONDANT COMPORTANT DEUX ELEMENTS DE VENTILATION | [2003/51] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/51] | 01.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/12] | 04.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AX]DE3014557 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [DE]) [A] 1,3 * page 17, line 20 - page 19, line 9 * [X] 4; | [A]FR2579032 (MERLIN GERIN [FR]) [A] 1* abstract * |