EP1377602 - USE OF ORGANOSILOXANE POLYSULPHIDES IN DIENIC ELASTOMERS COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/02] | POLYSULPHIDE ORGANOSILOXANES WHICH CAN BE USED AS COUPLING AGENTS, ELASTOMER COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING SAME AND ELASTOMER ARTICLES PREPARED FROM SAID COMPOSITIONS | ||
[2010/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2012 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHODIA CHIMIE 26, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92512 Boulogne Billancourt Cedex / FR | [2004/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARRUEL, Pierre 11, Chemin des Aubépines F-69340 FRANCHEVILLE / FR | 02 /
GUENNOUNI, Nathalie La Clairière 5, rue de la Fondation Dorothée Petit F-69540 IRIGNY / FR | [2004/02] | Representative(s) | Delenne, Marc, et al Specialty Operations France Intellectual Assets Management 52, rue de la Haie Coq 93306 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/21] | Delenne, Marc, et al Rhodia Services, Direction de la Propriété Industrielle, 40, rue de la Haie-Coq 93306 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2004/02] | Trolliet, Maurice, et al RHODIA SERVICES Direction de la Propriété Industrielle CRIT-Carrières - BP 62 69192 Saint-Fons Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 02724404.5 | 08.04.2002 | [2004/02] | WO2002FR01213 | Priority number, date | FR20010004877 | 10.04.2001 Original published format: FR 0104877 | [2004/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02083719 | Date: | 24.10.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1377602 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1377602 | Date: | 13.07.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/18, B60C19/08, B60C1/00, C08K3/04, C08K9/06, C08K9/04, C08K5/548, C08K5/54, C08L21/00, C08L9/00 | [2004/02] | CPC: |
C08K5/548 (EP,KR,US);
B60C1/00 (EP,KR,US);
B60C1/0016 (EP,US);
C07F7/1804 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/04 (KR);
C08K9/06 (KR);
C08L21/00 (KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/548, C08L21/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON ORGANOSILOXANPOLYSULFIDE IN DIENISCHE ELASTOMEREN-ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2010/18] | English: | USE OF ORGANOSILOXANE POLYSULPHIDES IN DIENIC ELASTOMERS COMPOSITIONS | [2010/18] | French: | UTILISATION D'ORGANOXYSILANES POLYSULFURÉS DANS DES COMPOSITIONS D'ÉLASTOMÈRES DIÉNIQUES | [2010/18] |
Former [2004/02] | POLYSULFID-ORGANOSILOXANE, DIE SICH ALS KUPPLUNGSMITTEL EIGNEN, ELASTOMERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, DIE DIESE ENTHALTEN, UND AUS DIESEN ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN HERGESTELLTE ELASTOMERARTIKEL | ||
Former [2004/02] | POLYSULPHIDE ORGANOSILOXANES WHICH CAN BE USED AS COUPLING AGENTS, ELASTOMER COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING SAME AND ELASTOMER ARTICLES PREPARED FROM SAID COMPOSITIONS | ||
Former [2004/02] | ORGANOXYSILANES POLYSULFURES UTILISABLES NOTAMMENT EN TANT QU'AGENT DE COUPLAGE, COMPOSITIONS D'ELASTOMERE(S) LES CONTENANT ET ARTICLES EN ELASTOMERE(S) PREPARES A PARTIR DE TELLES COMPOSITIONS | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/02] | 11.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 06.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 01.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 10.05.2007 | Appeal received No. T1432/07 | 18.07.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 10.09.2008 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | 10.09.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.09.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 10.09.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.11.2005 | Opposition(s) | 16.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/25] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 01.12.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 01.12.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | 28.08.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 24.08.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.09.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.07.2011 | CY | 13.07.2011 | DK | 13.07.2011 | FI | 13.07.2011 | IE | 13.07.2011 | SE | 13.07.2011 | TR | 13.07.2011 | GR | 14.10.2011 | ES | 24.10.2011 | PT | 14.11.2011 | [2014/21] |
Former [2013/22] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
IE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
ES | 24.10.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
IE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
IE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 13.07.2011 | |
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 13.07.2011 | |
PT | 14.11.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0764688 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [X] 1-4,12-23 * page 7, line 24 - line 44 ** page 9 - page 11; examples 1-14; tables 1-3 *; | [X]EP0941872 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [X] 1-4,12-23 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0019] * * page 6 - page 9; examples 1-3 *; | [XD]EP1043357 (DEGUSSA [DE]) [XD] 1-23 * page 5, paragraph 31 - page 6; table 3 * * page 4 - page 5 * | Examination | DE2141159 | DE2212239 | US3978103 | DE19541404 | EP0784072 | DE19734295 | WO02083782 |