EP1362320 - RADIO FREQUENCY IDENTIFICATION ARCHITECTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Symbol Technologies, Inc. One Symbol Plaza Holtsville, NY 11742 / US | [2011/06] |
Former [2007/18] | For all designated states SYMBOL TECHNOLOGIES, INC. One Symbol Plaza Holtsville, NY 11742 / US | ||
Former [2003/47] | For all designated states Matrics, Inc. Columbia Corporate Park 1, 8850 Stanford Boulevard, Suite 3000 Columbia, MD 21045 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARNESON, Michael, R. 1500 Conrose Drive Westminster, MD 21157 / US | 02 /
BANDY, William, R. 2406 Bell Branch Road Gambrills, MD 21054 / US | 03 /
POWELL, Kevin, J. 1202 Cherry Tree Lane Annapolis, MD 21403 / US | 04 /
SHANKS, Wayne, E. 1731 Lancaster Street Baltimore, MD 21231 / US | [2003/47] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof, Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/47] | Skone James, Robert Edmund GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 02724928.3 | 12.02.2002 | [2003/47] | WO2002US03989 | Priority number, date | US20010267713P | 12.02.2001 Original published format: US 267713 P | [2003/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02065380 | Date: | 22.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1362320 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1362320 | Date: | 09.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/00 | [2003/47] | CPC: |
G06K19/07749 (EP,US);
G06K17/00 (EP,US);
G06K19/0713 (EP,US);
G06K19/0723 (EP,US);
G06K19/07767 (EP,US);
G06K7/0008 (EP,US);
G06K7/10039 (EP,US);
G06K7/10069 (EP,US);
G06K7/10108 (EP,US);
G06K7/10356 (EP,US);
G08B13/2485 (EP,US);
G11C5/142 (EP,US);
H04L7/0331 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2011/06] |
Former [2003/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ARCHITEKTUR ZUR RADIOFREQUENZIDENTIFIZIERUNG | [2003/47] | English: | RADIO FREQUENCY IDENTIFICATION ARCHITECTURE | [2003/47] | French: | ARCHITECTURE D'IDENTIFICATION DES FREQUENCES RADIO | [2003/47] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.09.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/47] | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 06.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10182801.0 / EP2287777 | EP10182810.1 / EP2287778 | EP10182820.0 / EP2287779 | Opposition(s) | 10.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.02.2011 | BE | 09.02.2011 | CY | 09.02.2011 | DK | 09.02.2011 | FI | 09.02.2011 | IT | 09.02.2011 | NL | 09.02.2011 | SE | 09.02.2011 | TR | 09.02.2011 | IE | 12.02.2011 | LU | 12.02.2011 | CH | 28.02.2011 | LI | 28.02.2011 | MC | 28.02.2011 | FR | 11.04.2011 | GR | 10.05.2011 | ES | 20.05.2011 | PT | 09.06.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/25] | AT | 09.02.2011 | |
BE | 09.02.2011 | ||
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
IT | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
IE | 12.02.2011 | ||
LU | 12.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
FR | 11.04.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 09.02.2011 | |
BE | 09.02.2011 | ||
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
IT | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
IE | 12.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
FR | 11.04.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/22] | AT | 09.02.2011 | |
BE | 09.02.2011 | ||
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
IE | 12.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
FR | 11.04.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 09.02.2011 | |
BE | 09.02.2011 | ||
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
IE | 12.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 09.02.2011 | |
BE | 09.02.2011 | ||
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | AT | 09.02.2011 | |
BE | 09.02.2011 | ||
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/39] | AT | 09.02.2011 | |
BE | 09.02.2011 | ||
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | BE | 09.02.2011 | |
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
SE | 09.02.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | SE | 09.02.2011 | |
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0702324 (IBM [US]) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0702323 (IBM [US]) [X] 1-7* the whole document *; | [X]US5856788 (WALTER RONALD [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * the whole document * | Examination | US6052015 |