EP1384360 - MODEM RELAY OVER A PACKET NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.08.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mindspeed Technologies, Inc. 4000 MacArthur Blvd., East Tower Newport Beach, CA 92660-3095 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Mindspeed Technologies, Inc. 4000 MacArthur Blvd., East Tower Newport Beach, CA 92660 / US | ||
Former [2004/05] | For all designated states Conexant Systems, Inc. 4311 Jamboree Road Newport Beach, CA 92660 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEADLE, Michael, S. 10117 Albee Avenue Tustin, XA 92782-1454 / US | 02 /
WREN, Paul 520 Chemin de Caladou F-06560 Valbonne / FR | 03 /
CHEN, Zhihui 1 Calico Ct. Trabuco Canyon, CA 92679 / US | 04 /
KANDIAH, Skantha c/o Conexant Systems, Inc. 4311 Jamboree Road Newport Beach. CA 92660 / US | 05 /
CHU, Keith 24522 Sutton Lane Laguna Niguel, CA 92677 / US | [2004/15] |
Former [2004/05] | 01 /
BEADLE, Michael, S. 10117 Albee Avenue Tustin, XA 92782-1454 / US | ||
02 /
WREN, Paul 520 Chemin de Caladou F-06560 Valbonne / FR | |||
03 /
CHEN, Zhihui 1 Calico Ct. Trabuco Canyon, CA 92679 / US | |||
04 /
KANDIAH, Skantha 168 Santa Louisa Irvine, CA 92606 / US | |||
05 /
CHU, Keith 24522 Sutton Lane Laguna Niguel, CA 92677 / US | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/03] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/41] | Kindermann, Peter Kindermann Patentanwälte Postfach 100234 85593 Baldham / DE | ||
Former [2004/05] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing. Wagner & Geyer, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02725316.0 | 22.03.2002 | [2004/05] | WO2002US08892 | Priority number, date | US20010288151P | 01.05.2001 Original published format: US 288151 P | US20010288775P | 04.05.2001 Original published format: US 288775 P | [2004/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02089440 | Date: | 07.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1384360 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/66 | [2004/05] | CPC: |
H04L5/1438 (EP,US);
H04L12/4633 (EP,US);
H04L69/085 (EP);
H04L9/40 (EP,US);
H04L69/08 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODEM-RELAIS ÜBER EIN PACKET-NETZWERK | [2004/05] | English: | MODEM RELAY OVER A PACKET NETWORK | [2004/05] | French: | RELAIS DE MODEM SUR UN RESEAU PAR PAQUETS | [2004/05] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 15.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/05] | 12.01.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/37] | 24.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.05.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9749228 (PARADYNE CORP [US]) [A] 1-54 * abstract * * page 5, line 1 - line L * * page 6, line 1 - line L * * page 11, line 19 - page 12, line 2 ** claims 1,2,6 *; | [A]FR2771577 (FRANCE TELECOM [FR]) [A] 1-54 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 7 * * page 4, line 28 - line L * * page 5, line 15 - line 24 * * page 8, line 10 - page 9, line 11 * * page 10, line 24 - line 32 * * page 11, line 32 - page 12, line 32 * * page 14, line 27 - page 15, line 5 * * page 17, line 3 - page 18, line 14 * * claims 1,2 * * figure 1 * |