EP1389327 - ELECTRONIC SHIPPING SYSTEM FOR PACKAGE PICKUP AND ANYWHERE TO ANYWHERE DELIVERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.03.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 15.04.2009 [2009/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNITED PARCEL SERVICE OF AMERICA, INC. 55 Glenlake Parkway, N.E. Atlanta, GA 30328 / US | [2004/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOODS, Bruce 7 Glen Avenue Stockholm, NJ 07460 / US | 02 /
DONOHUE, Mike 7345 Polo Hill Cumming, GA 30040 / US | [2004/08] | Representative(s) | Chettle, Adrian John, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/08] | Chettle, Adrian John, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 02725429.1 | 29.03.2002 | [2004/08] | WO2002US09847 | Priority number, date | US20010280063P | 30.03.2001 Original published format: US 280063 P | [2004/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02080436 | Date: | 10.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1389327 | Date: | 18.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2004/08] | CPC: |
G06Q10/08 (EP,US);
G06Q10/083 (EP,US);
G06Q20/02 (EP,US);
G06Q30/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHES VERSANDSYSTEM ZUR PAKETABNAHME UND FÜR DIE ANYWHERE-TO-ANYWHERE-ABLIEFERUNG | [2004/08] | English: | ELECTRONIC SHIPPING SYSTEM FOR PACKAGE PICKUP AND ANYWHERE TO ANYWHERE DELIVERY | [2004/08] | French: | SYSTEME D'EXPEDITION ELECTRONIQUE POUR LE RAMASSAGE DE COLIS ET LA DISTRIBUTION GEOGRAPHIQUEMENT ILLIMITEE | [2004/08] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2003 | Search fee paid | 12.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/08] | 26.04.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/16] | 14.08.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/16] | 25.11.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search | International search | [A]FR2561949 (ARC SERVICES [FR]); | [A]JPH0920411 (MURATA MACHINERY LTD); | [XP]EP1150227 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]); | [XE]JP2002205821 (SAGAWA EXPRESS CO LTD) |