EP1451839 - INTELLIGENT CIRCUIT BREAKER MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pluris, Inc. 10455 Bandley Drive Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2004/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOVINSKY, Sam 1254 Sandra Drive San Jose, CA 95125 / US | 02 /
SKIRMONT, David 417H Cork Harbor Circle Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | [2004/36] | Representative(s) | Schäfer, Wolfgang Dreiss Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/06] | Schäfer, Wolfgang Dreiss Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2004/36] | Schäfer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 02725491.1 | 03.04.2002 | [2004/36] | WO2002US10427 | Priority number, date | US20010849055 | 03.05.2001 Original published format: US 849055 | [2004/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02091414 | Date: | 14.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1451839 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1451839 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.05.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02B11/173 | [2011/38] | CPC: |
H02B11/173 (EP,US);
H01H2009/0083 (EP,US);
H01H2071/086 (EP,US);
H01H71/04 (EP,US);
H01H9/167 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/36] | H01H3/20, H01H9/28, H02B1/04, H02B5/00, H02B11/12, H05K5/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/36] | Title | German: | INTELLIGENTES UNTERBRECHERSCHALTERMODUL | [2004/36] | English: | INTELLIGENT CIRCUIT BREAKER MODULE | [2004/36] | French: | MODULE DE DISJONCTEUR INTELLIGENT | [2004/36] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2003 | Search fee paid | 21.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 01.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.02.2012 | BE | 08.02.2012 | CY | 08.02.2012 | DK | 08.02.2012 | FI | 08.02.2012 | IT | 08.02.2012 | NL | 08.02.2012 | SE | 08.02.2012 | TR | 08.02.2012 | IE | 03.04.2012 | LU | 03.04.2012 | CH | 30.04.2012 | LI | 30.04.2012 | MC | 30.04.2012 | GR | 09.05.2012 | ES | 19.05.2012 | PT | 08.06.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
TR | 08.02.2012 | ||
IE | 03.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
IE | 03.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
IE | 03.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | NL | 08.02.2012 | |
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | NL | 08.02.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2594266 (MERLIN GERIN [FR]) [X] 1-4,6-9,11-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US4885436 (PHAM HOA [US], et al) [A] 1-16* column 1, line 6 - line 56 *; | [A]US4931907 (ROBINSON RICHARD P [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * column 1, line 5 - line 60 *; | [A]US5113043 (MORRIS ROBERT A [US]) [A] 1-16 * column 2, line 23 - line 28 *; | [A]US6137068 (PADULO MICHAEL N [CA]) [A] 1-16 * column 1, line 5 - line 26; figures 7,8 *; | [X]EP1089408 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,6-9,11-15 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US4885436 (PHAM HOA [US], et al); | [Y]US4931907 (ROBINSON RICHARD P [US], et al); | [Y]US5113043 (MORRIS ROBERT A [US]); | [Y]US6137068 (PADULO MICHAEL N [CA]) | Examination | DE19833607 |