EP1386183 - A SYSTEM AND METHODS FOR FILTERING ELECTROMAGNETIC VISUAL, AND MINIMIZING ACOUSTIC TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.07.2006 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.08.2006 [2006/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Astic Signals Defenses L.L.C. 5917 Liberty Road Baltimore, MD 21207 / US | For all designated states Winckler, Lisa 741 Colonial Drive Collinsville, VA 24078 / US | [2004/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Simpson, Deron, S 1973 Orkney Drive Finksburg, MD 21048 / US | 02 /
WINCKLER, Lisa 741 Colonial Drive Collinsville, VA 24078 / US | [2004/06] | Representative(s) | Siniscalco, Fabio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato 8 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/06] | Siniscalco, Fabio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 02725877.1 | 03.05.2002 | [2004/06] | WO2002US13735 | Priority number, date | US20010288073P | 03.05.2001 Original published format: US 288073 P | [2004/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02091042 | Date: | 14.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1386183 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/20, C03C17/38 | [2004/06] | CPC: |
G02B5/208 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR FILTERUNG ELEKTROMAGNETISCHER SICHTBARER UND MINIMIERUNG AKUSTISCHER TRANSMISSION | [2004/06] | English: | A SYSTEM AND METHODS FOR FILTERING ELECTROMAGNETIC VISUAL, AND MINIMIZING ACOUSTIC TRANSMISSION | [2004/06] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDES DE FILTRAGE ET DE MINIMISATION DE TRANSMISSIONS ACOUSTIQUES ELECTROMAGNETIQUES, VISUELLES | [2004/06] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/06] | 04.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/33] | 31.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/33] | Request for further processing for: | 30.05.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 30.05.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.06.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5811923 (ZIEBA JAROSLAW [US], et al) [Y] 1-31,35-37 * column 2, line 1 - column 3, line 13 *; | [Y]US5991072 (SOLYNTJES ALAN J [US], et al) [Y] 1-31,35-37 * column 2, line 6 - line 47; example -; claim - *; | [A]US6028699 (FISHER DONALD S [US]) [A] 1-38 * column 1, line 42 - column 2, line 44; claim - *; | [PA]WO0144840 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP], et al) [PA] 1-38 * claim - *; | EP1176436 [ ] (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) | by applicant | US288093 | US6007901 | US6221112 | US3943105 | US4047889 | US4055971 | US4115054 | US4557980 |