EP1404905 - ALIPHATIC POLYESTER MICROFIBERS, MICROFIBRILLATED ARTICLES AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3437 / US | ||
Former [2004/15] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3437 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOBBS, Terry, R Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
SOO, Philip, P. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
PEREZ, Mario, A. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
HAAS, Christopher, K. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
KODY, Robert, S. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2004/15] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/15] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02725997.7 | 10.05.2002 | [2004/15] | WO2002US15078 | Priority number, date | US20010298817P | 15.06.2001 Original published format: US 298817 P | [2004/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02103094 | Date: | 27.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1404905 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1404905 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | D01F6/62, D01D5/42, C08J5/18, C08L67/04 | [2006/42] | CPC: |
D01D5/423 (EP,US);
D01F6/625 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24994 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2904 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2913 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2969 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/15] | D01F6/62, D01D5/42, // C08J5:18, C08L67:04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIKROFASERN AUS ALIPHATISCHEM POLYESTER, MIKROFIBRILLIERTE GEGENSTÄNDE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2007/12] | English: | ALIPHATIC POLYESTER MICROFIBERS, MICROFIBRILLATED ARTICLES AND USE THEREOF | [2004/15] | French: | MICROFIBRES EN POLYESTER ALIPHATIQUE, ARTICLES MICROFIBRILLES ET UTILISATION CORRESPONDANTE | [2004/15] |
Former [2004/15] | MIKROFASERN AUS ALIPHATISCHEM POLYESTER, MIKROFIBRILLIERETE ARTIKEL UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.01.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 26.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.04.2007 | BE | 04.04.2007 | CH | 04.04.2007 | CY | 04.04.2007 | DK | 04.04.2007 | FI | 04.04.2007 | FR | 04.04.2007 | IT | 04.04.2007 | LI | 04.04.2007 | NL | 04.04.2007 | TR | 04.04.2007 | IE | 10.05.2007 | LU | 10.05.2007 | MC | 31.05.2007 | SE | 04.07.2007 | GR | 05.07.2007 | PT | 04.09.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CY | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
FR | 04.04.2007 | ||
IT | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 10.05.2007 | ||
LU | 10.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CY | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
FR | 04.04.2007 | ||
IT | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 10.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/52] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
FR | 04.04.2007 | ||
IT | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 10.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IT | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 10.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
FR | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IT | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | CH | 04.04.2007 | |
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0046435 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [A] 16-47 * the whole document *; | [D]US6110588 (PEREZ MARIO A [US], et al); | [DA]WO0068301 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [DA] 16-47* the whole document *; | [X]EP1091028 (FIBER INNOVATION TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [X] 1-15,42 * paragraphs [0030] - [0035] - [0039] , [0040]; claim - * |