EP1373706 - INJECTION VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2010 | Opposition rejected | published on 17.02.2010 [2010/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2006/25] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUEGER, Johannes-Jörg Trauttmannsdorffgasse 19/1 1130 Wien / AT | 02 /
STOECKLEIN, Wolfgang Ludwigstr. 34b 70176 Stuttgart / DE | 03 /
SCHMIEDER, Dietmar Silcherstrasse 12 71706 Markgroeningen / DE | [2004/10] |
Former [2004/01] | 01 /
RUEGER, Johannes-Jörg Gutenbergstrasse 21 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | ||
02 /
STOECKLEIN, Wolfgang Ludwigstr. 34b 70176 Stuttgart / DE | |||
03 /
SCHMIEDER, Dietmar Silcherstrasse 12 71706 Markgroeningen / DE | Application number, filing date | 02726068.6 | 21.03.2002 | [2004/01] | WO2002DE01025 | Priority number, date | DE2001113560 | 21.03.2001 Original published format: DE 10113560 | [2004/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02077437 | Date: | 03.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1373706 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1373706 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F02M51/06, F02M59/46, F02M47/02, F02D41/20 | [2006/03] | CPC: |
F02M63/0036 (EP,US);
F02D41/2096 (EP,US);
F02M47/027 (EP,US);
F02M63/0026 (EP,US);
F02M2200/703 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/01] | F02M51/06, F02M59/46, F02M47/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/01] | Title | German: | EINSPRITZVENTIL | [2004/01] | English: | INJECTION VALVE | [2004/01] | French: | SOUPAPE D'INJECTION | [2004/01] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 21.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.03.2007
20.04.2007
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.03.2007
20.04.2007
ADMISSIBLE SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.03.2007
Siemens AG CT IP SV Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | 27.04.2007 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.07.2007 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.08.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.10.2009 | 26.08.2009 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 29.09.2009 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 06.10.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.10.2009 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2010/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 21.06.2006 | FI | 21.06.2006 | IE | 21.06.2006 | NL | 21.06.2006 | TR | 21.06.2006 | DK | 21.09.2006 | SE | 21.09.2006 | GR | 22.09.2006 | ES | 02.10.2006 | PT | 21.11.2006 | AT | 21.03.2007 | LU | 21.03.2007 | BE | 31.03.2007 | CH | 31.03.2007 | LI | 31.03.2007 | MC | 31.03.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | CY | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
AT | 21.03.2007 | ||
LU | 21.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
CH | 31.03.2007 | ||
LI | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/29] | FI | 21.06.2006 | |
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
AT | 21.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
CH | 31.03.2007 | ||
LI | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | FI | 21.06.2006 | |
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
CH | 31.03.2007 | ||
LI | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | FI | 21.06.2006 | |
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
CH | 31.03.2007 | ||
LI | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | FI | 21.06.2006 | |
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | FI | 21.06.2006 | |
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | FI | 21.06.2006 | |
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 21.06.2006 | |
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | FI | 21.06.2006 | |
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 21.06.2006 | |
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | FI | 21.06.2006 | |
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 21.06.2006 | |
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 21.09.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH10306762 ; | [A]JPH10169524 ; | [Y]DE4306072 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [Y]DE19848950 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]); | [A]US6082332 (HEFLER GREGORY W [US], et al); | [PA]DE19945670 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) |