EP1374428 - TRANSCEIVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.05.2006 [2006/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | [2004/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUSCHALLIK, Claus Dorfstr. 33 h 82024 Taufkirchen / DE | 02 /
PFLAUM, Bernd Bozaunweg 23 e 82008 Unterhaching / DE | 03 /
SEDLMAIER, Robert Hofbergerstr. 1e 28 85579 Neubiberg / DE | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schlossschmidstrasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | Epping Hermann & Fischer Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02726073.6 | 26.03.2002 | [2004/01] | WO2002DE01098 | Priority number, date | DE2001114779 | 26.03.2001 Original published format: DE 10114779 | [2004/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02078200 | Date: | 03.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1374428 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1374428 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/40, H04B1/30 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
H04B1/30 (EP,US);
H04B1/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/21] |
Former [2004/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | SENDE- UND EMPFANGSEINHEIT | [2004/01] | English: | TRANSCEIVER | [2004/01] | French: | UNIT D' MISSION ET DE R CEPTION | [2004/01] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 11.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US5337005 (FENK JOSEF [DE], et al) [X] 1,9,10 * the whole document * [A] 2-8; | [A]US5604927 (MOORE PAUL A [GB]) [A] 5,6* the whole document *; | [A]US5715530 (EUL HERMANN-JOSEF [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9934625 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 5,6 * page 5, line 10 - page 7, line 23 * * figure 2 *; | [XA]US6047178 (FRLAN EDWARD [CA]) [X] 1,9,10 * the whole document * [A] 2-8; | [A]US6137999 (LOVELACE DAVID KEVIN [US], et al) [A] 2-4,7,8 * the whole document * |