EP1394681 - METHOD FOR PROVIDING BULLETIN BOARD FOR PLACING AN IMAGE AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING ELECTRONIC ALBUM SERVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nikon Corporation 15-3, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6290 / JP | For all designated states Nikon Systems Inc. 2-3-3, Minatomirai, Nishi-ku Yokohama-city Kanagawa 220-6116 / JP | [2015/36] |
Former [2010/30] | For all designated states NIKON CORPORATION 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | ||
For all designated states Nikon Systems Inc. 2-3-3, Minatomirai, Nishi-ku Yokohama-city Kanagawa 220-6116 / JP | |||
Former [2006/29] | For all designated states Nikon Corporation 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | ||
For all designated states Nikon Systems Inc. 2-3-3, Minatomirai, Nishi-ku Yokohama-city Kanagawa 220-6116 / JP | |||
Former [2004/10] | For all designated states Nikon Corporation 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | ||
For all designated states Nikon Technologies, Inc. 3-25 Futaba 1-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 142-0043 / JP | |||
For all designated states Nikon Systems Inc. 2-3-3, Minatomirai, Nishi-ku Yokohama-city, Kanagawa 220-6116 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MITSUHASHI, Setsu, NIKON CORPORATION 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | 02 /
OHMURA, Akira, NIKON TECHNOLOGIES INC. 3-25, Futaba 1-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 142-0043 / JP | 03 /
TOIDA, Takashi, NIKON SYSTEMS INC. 2-3-3, Minatomirai, Nishi-ku Yokohama-city, Kanagawa 220-6116 / JP | [2004/10] | Representative(s) | Hewett, Jonathan Michael Richard, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2014/11] |
Former [2004/10] | Walaski, Jan Filip Venner, Shipley & Co, 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 02726433.2 | 17.05.2002 | [2004/10] | WO2002JP04811 | Priority number, date | JP20010149837 | 18.05.2001 Original published format: JP 2001149837 | JP20010149860 | 18.05.2001 Original published format: JP 2001149860 | JP20010149870 | 18.05.2001 Original published format: JP 2001149870 | [2004/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02095597 | Date: | 28.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1394681 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.11.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/00, G06F17/30, G06F17/60, G06F15/00, G06T1/00 | [2004/10] | CPC: |
G06Q30/016 (EP,US);
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0601 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0625 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0643 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINES BULLETIN-BORDS ZUR PLAZIERUNG EINES BILDES UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINES ELEKTRONISCHEN ALBUMDIENSTES | [2004/10] | English: | METHOD FOR PROVIDING BULLETIN BOARD FOR PLACING AN IMAGE AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING ELECTRONIC ALBUM SERVICE | [2004/10] | French: | PROCEDE DE CREATION D'UN PANNEAU BBS DESTINE A ACCUEILLIR UNE IMAGE ET PROCEDE POUR FOURNIR UN SERVICE D'ALBUM ELECTRONIQUE | [2004/10] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2003 | Translation filed | 01.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2003 | Search fee paid | 01.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 01.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 13.06.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2015 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 18.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/07] | 22.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: information on prior art not received in time [2016/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.02.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 19.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search | International search | [Y]JPH11203359 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [Y]JP2000347971 (SONY CORP); | [Y]JPS6330943 (NEC CORP, et al); | [Y]JP2000341644 (CANON KK); | [A]JP2000020368 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) | [Y] - EMIKO OGAMI, "Shikosei kara communication e image business shijo ni idomu, digital album site 'Photo Highway Japan'", NIKKEI WEB COMPANY, (DENPA SHINBUNSHA), (20001008), vol. 1, no. 1, pages 110 - 111, XP002966379 | [Y] - HITOSHI SAO, "Tada de tsukutte kashikoku tsukau HTML no technique, suguni tsukaeru kijutsu-rei tsuki", DAI 2-KAI, PCING, (GAKKEN CO., LTD.), (19990801), vol. 11, no. 8, pages 72 - 75, XP002966380 |