EP1368728 - SYNCHRONOUS, CLOCKED COMMUNICATION SYSTEM WITH A RELATIVE TIME CLOCK AND METHOD FOR ESTABLISHING SUCH A SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/50] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANKE, Michael Naturbadstrasse 2a 91056 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
HEIDER, Alexander Elise-Spaeth-Strasse 11 91058 Erlangen / DE | 03 /
KIESEL, Martin Jahnstrasse 36 91099 Poxdorf / DE | [2003/50] | Application number, filing date | 02727204.6 | 11.03.2002 | [2003/50] | WO2002DE00855 | Priority number, date | DE2001113260 | 16.03.2001 Original published format: DE 10113260 | [2003/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02075509 | Date: | 26.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1368728 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1368728 | Date: | 27.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/14, H04J3/06 | [2003/50] | CPC: |
H04J3/0652 (EP,US);
G06F1/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/50] | Title | German: | SYNCHRONES, GETAKTETES KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM MIT RELATIVUHR UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUFBAU EINES SOLCHEN SYSTEMS | [2003/50] | English: | SYNCHRONOUS, CLOCKED COMMUNICATION SYSTEM WITH A RELATIVE TIME CLOCK AND METHOD FOR ESTABLISHING SUCH A SYSTEM | [2003/50] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION SYNCHRONE ET CADENCE, COMPORTANT UNE HORLOGE RELATIVE, ET PROCEDE POUR REALISER UN TEL SYSTEME | [2003/50] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/50] | 26.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.01.2010 | DK | 27.01.2010 | FI | 27.01.2010 | IE | 27.01.2010 | NL | 27.01.2010 | SE | 27.01.2010 | TR | 27.01.2010 | LU | 11.03.2010 | CH | 31.03.2010 | LI | 31.03.2010 | MC | 31.03.2010 | GR | 28.04.2010 | PT | 27.05.2010 | [2015/21] |
Former [2012/47] | CY | 27.01.2010 | |
DK | 27.01.2010 | ||
FI | 27.01.2010 | ||
IE | 27.01.2010 | ||
NL | 27.01.2010 | ||
SE | 27.01.2010 | ||
TR | 27.01.2010 | ||
LU | 11.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
GR | 28.04.2010 | ||
PT | 27.05.2010 | ||
Former [2012/43] | CY | 27.01.2010 | |
DK | 27.01.2010 | ||
FI | 27.01.2010 | ||
IE | 27.01.2010 | ||
NL | 27.01.2010 | ||
SE | 27.01.2010 | ||
LU | 11.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
GR | 28.04.2010 | ||
PT | 27.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | CY | 27.01.2010 | |
DK | 27.01.2010 | ||
FI | 27.01.2010 | ||
IE | 27.01.2010 | ||
NL | 27.01.2010 | ||
SE | 27.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
GR | 28.04.2010 | ||
PT | 27.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | CY | 27.01.2010 | |
DK | 27.01.2010 | ||
FI | 27.01.2010 | ||
IE | 27.01.2010 | ||
NL | 27.01.2010 | ||
SE | 27.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
GR | 28.04.2010 | ||
PT | 27.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | CY | 27.01.2010 | |
FI | 27.01.2010 | ||
IE | 27.01.2010 | ||
NL | 27.01.2010 | ||
SE | 27.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
GR | 28.04.2010 | ||
PT | 27.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/47] | CY | 27.01.2010 | |
FI | 27.01.2010 | ||
IE | 27.01.2010 | ||
NL | 27.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
GR | 28.04.2010 | ||
PT | 27.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | FI | 27.01.2010 | |
IE | 27.01.2010 | ||
NL | 27.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
GR | 28.04.2010 | ||
PT | 27.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | FI | 27.01.2010 | |
NL | 27.01.2010 | ||
PT | 27.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | NL | 27.01.2010 | |
PT | 27.05.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9814851 (FISHER CONTROLS INT [US], et al) [A] 1,2,11,15,16,18,19,28,32,33 * page 18, line 9 - page 19, line 15 ** page 22, line 28 - page 23, line 5; figure 1 *; | [PXA]DE10004425 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [PX] 1,6,7,18,23,24 * abstract * * column 23, line 33 - column 27, line 56; figure 1 * [PA] 2-4,8,16,17,19-21,25,33,34 |