EP1373784 - PIPE FRACTURE SAFETY FOR A VACUUM-INSULATED FILLING LINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde AG Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states Linde Aktiengesellschaft Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRAUS, Harald Daiserstrasse 22 81371 München / DE | 02 /
REESE, Wilfried-Henning Käthe-Kollwitz-Str. 24 85716 Unterschleissheim / DE | [2004/01] | Application number, filing date | 02727524.7 | 05.04.2002 | [2004/01] | WO2002EP03773 | Priority number, date | DE2001117329 | 06.04.2001 Original published format: DE 10117329 | [2004/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02081956 | Date: | 17.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1373784 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1373784 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16L59/06, G01M3/28, B60S5/02, F17C5/00 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
F17D5/02 (EP,US);
F16L55/05 (EP,US);
F16L9/18 (EP,US);
G01M3/283 (EP,US);
G01M3/2892 (EP,US);
Y02E60/34 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROHRBRUCHSICHERUNG FÜR EINE VAKUUMISOLIERTE BEFÜLLLEITUNG | [2004/01] | English: | PIPE FRACTURE SAFETY FOR A VACUUM-INSULATED FILLING LINE | [2004/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SECURITE ANTI-RUPTURE POUR CONDUITES DE REMPLISSAGE A ISOLATION PAR LE VIDE | [2004/01] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 25.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 15.09.2004 | FR | 15.09.2004 | GB | 15.09.2004 | IE | 15.09.2004 | IT | 15.09.2004 | NL | 15.09.2004 | TR | 15.09.2004 | DK | 15.12.2004 | GR | 15.12.2004 | SE | 15.12.2004 | ES | 26.12.2004 | PT | 15.02.2005 | CY | 05.04.2005 | LU | 05.04.2005 | BE | 30.04.2005 | MC | 30.04.2005 | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/38] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
FR | 15.09.2004 | ||
GB | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
IT | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
TR | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
CY | 05.04.2005 | ||
LU | 05.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
MC | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/27] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
FR | 15.09.2004 | ||
GB | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
TR | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
CY | 05.04.2005 | ||
LU | 05.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
MC | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
FR | 15.09.2004 | ||
GB | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
TR | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
CY | 05.04.2005 | ||
LU | 05.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
FR | 15.09.2004 | ||
GB | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
TR | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
CY | 05.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
LU | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/11] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
FR | 15.09.2004 | ||
GB | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
TR | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
LU | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
FR | 15.09.2004 | ||
GB | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
TR | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/32] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
FR | 15.09.2004 | ||
GB | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
GB | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
GB | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
NL | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
GB | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/27] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
ES | 26.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
IE | 15.09.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 15.09.2004 | |
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 15.12.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3907336 (SIEGMUND WERNER) [A] 1* column 3, line 3 - column 3, line 8; figure 4 *; | [XY]DE2504519 (KABEL METALLWERKE GHH) [X] 1 * page 1, line 1 - page 1, line 17; figures 1,2 * [Y] 2-6; | [Y]US4511162 (BROYLES ROBERT K [US]) [Y] 2-4 * abstract *; | [A]DE4104766 (LINDE AG [DE]) [A] 1,5,6 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5365981 (PESCHKA WALTER [DE], et al) [Y] 5,6 * abstract *; | [X]EP0949444 (SEMPERIT AG [AT]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]US6171025 (LANGNER CARL GOTTLIEB [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 7, line 8 - column 7, line 23; figure 2 * |