EP1388248 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR LOCATION BASED WEB SERVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.06.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.07.2007 [2007/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2004/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NYKANEN, Petri Lehdokkikatu 3 FIN-37120 Nokia / FI | 02 /
MURTO, Juhani Orapihlajatie 13 A FIN-00320 Helsinki / FI | 03 /
OINONEN, Kari Simunantie 11 FIN-33800 Lempaala / FI | [2004/07] | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/07] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02727890.2 | 14.05.2002 | [2004/07] | WO2002IB01642 | Priority number, date | US20010858182 | 15.05.2001 Original published format: US 858182 | [2004/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02093291 | Date: | 21.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1388248 | Date: | 11.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.04.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/66, H04Q7/38 | [2004/30] | CPC: |
H04W4/02 (EP);
H04W4/029 (US);
H04W64/00 (EP,US);
H04W8/16 (EP,US);
H04W88/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/07] | H04M1/66 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/07] | Extension states | AL | 04.11.2003 | LT | 04.11.2003 | LV | 04.11.2003 | MK | 04.11.2003 | RO | 04.11.2003 | SI | 04.11.2003 | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR WEB-DIENSTE AUF STANDORTBASIS | [2004/07] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR LOCATION BASED WEB SERVICES | [2004/07] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR SERVICES WEB BASES SUR L'EMPLACEMENT | [2004/07] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2003 | Search fee paid | 03.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/07] | 03.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/27] | 29.05.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.06.2007 | 29.05.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 22.06.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9904582 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-16 * page 1, line 9 - page 21, line 17 * * figures 1-9 * [Y] 17-20; | [A]WO9912378 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-20 * page 7, line 19 - page 13, line 26 ** figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US6138003 (KINGDON CHRISTOPHER H [US], et al) [Y] 17-20 * page 7, line 19 - page 13, line 26; figures 1-3 * | International search | [A]US6138003 (KINGDON CHRISTOPHER H [US], et al); | [YP]US2001018349 (KINNUNEN JAIR [FI], et al); | [XP]US6347227 (JOHANSSON JOERGEN [SE]); | [YP]US6377810 (GEIGER ROBERT L [US], et al); | [AE]US2002077084 (ZELLNER SAMUEL N [US], et al); | [XE]US2002094822 (ANCTIL SUSAN [CA], et al) | Examination | US6002639 | WO0131965 | - TANG HAITO ET AL, "Serving Spatial Location Information over the Internet", LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE, SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN, DE, (1987), pages 248 - 253, XP007901744 |