EP1382051 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR COOLING ELECTRICAL FUSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2014/10] |
Former [2004/04] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINDHOLM, Brian, Eric 616 Fairwiev Avenue Blacksburg, VA 24060 / US | 02 /
PATE, Paul, Stephen 3221 Anthony Lane Troutville, VA 24175 / US | 03 /
RITTER, Allen, Michael 3333 Southwood Village Court Roanoke, VA 24014 / US | [2004/13] |
Former [2004/04] | 01 /
LINDHOLM, Brian, Eric 616 Fairwiev Avenue Blacksburg, VA 24060 / US | ||
02 /
PATE, Paul, Stephen 3221 Anthony Lane Troutville, VA 24175 / US | |||
03 /
RITTER, Allen, Michael 3617 Verona Terrace Roanoke, VA 24018 / US | Representative(s) | Szary, Anne Catherine, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [2013/37] |
Former [2004/04] | Pedder, James Cuthbert London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 02728854.7 | 19.04.2002 | [2004/04] | WO2002US12420 | Priority number, date | US20010284819P | 19.04.2001 Original published format: US 284819 P | US20020683496 | 09.01.2002 Original published format: US 683496 | [2004/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02086930 | Date: | 31.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1382051 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1382051 | Date: | 05.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01H85/47 | [2004/04] | CPC: |
H01H85/47 (EP,US);
Y10S165/907 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/04] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM KÜHLEN VON ELEKTRISCHEN SICHERUNGEN | [2004/04] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR COOLING ELECTRICAL FUSES | [2004/04] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE REFROIDISSEMENT DE FUSIBLES ELECTRIQUES | [2004/04] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/04] | 27.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.03.2014 | BE | 05.03.2014 | CY | 05.03.2014 | DK | 05.03.2014 | ES | 05.03.2014 | FI | 05.03.2014 | IT | 05.03.2014 | MC | 05.03.2014 | NL | 05.03.2014 | SE | 05.03.2014 | TR | 05.03.2014 | IE | 19.04.2014 | LU | 19.04.2014 | FR | 05.05.2014 | GB | 05.06.2014 | GR | 06.06.2014 | PT | 07.07.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/28] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
IE | 19.04.2014 | ||
FR | 05.05.2014 | ||
GB | 05.06.2014 | ||
GR | 06.06.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
IE | 19.04.2014 | ||
FR | 05.05.2014 | ||
GB | 05.06.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
IE | 19.04.2014 | ||
FR | 05.05.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
FR | 05.05.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
FR | 05.05.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR91187E (FERRAZ & CIE LUCIEN) [X] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [XY]DE2029083 (BRICHANT F) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2-23; | [XY]GB1221387 (FERRAZ & CIE LUCIEN [FR]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2-23; | [XY]US3671911 (KOZACKA FREDERICK J) [X] 1 * the whole document *[Y] 2-23; | [XY]US3678431 (FRANKLIN LEROY H) [X] 1 * figure 3; claims 1,3-6 * * column 1 * * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 32 * [Y] 2-23; | [XY]FR2183852 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2-23; | [XY]FR2420202 (FERRAZ & CIE LUCIEN [FR]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 31 - line 36; figure - * [Y] 2-23 |