EP1390012 - NOVEL METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR DELIVERING MACROMOLECULES TO OR VIA THE RESPIRATORY TRACT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.2010 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/32] | For all designated states NOVARTIS AG Lichtstrasse 35 4002 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2004/09] | For all designated states Nektar Therapeutics 150 Industrial Road San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOT, Adrian 3899 Nobel Drive, Apt. 1117 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | 02 /
DELLAMARY, Luis, A. 838 Redberry Court San Marcos, CA 92069-1846 / US | 03 /
SMITH, Dan 4004 Caminito Meliado San Diego, CA 92122 / US | [2004/09] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/09] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02728994.1 | 26.04.2002 | [2004/09] | WO2002US13145 | Priority number, date | US20010286891P | 26.04.2001 Original published format: US 286891 P | [2004/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02087542 | Date: | 07.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1390012 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.11.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/127, A61K9/12, A61K9/14, A61K9/16, A61K9/50, A61K9/52 | [2004/09] | CPC: |
A61K9/0075 (EP);
B82Y5/00 (EP);
A61K9/1075 (EP);
A61K9/127 (EP);
A61K9/1617 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/09] | Extension states | AL | 26.11.2003 | LT | 26.11.2003 | LV | 26.11.2003 | MK | 26.11.2003 | RO | 26.11.2003 | SI | 26.11.2003 | Title | German: | NEUE VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR FREISETZUNG VON MAKROMOLEKÜLEN AN DIE ODER ÜBER DIE ATEMWEGE | [2004/09] | English: | NOVEL METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR DELIVERING MACROMOLECULES TO OR VIA THE RESPIRATORY TRACT | [2004/09] | French: | NOUVELLES METHODES ET COMPOSITIONS D'ADMINISTRATION DE MACROMOLECULES AUX VOIES RESPIRATOIRES OU VIA CELLES-CI | [2004/09] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2003 | Search fee paid | 26.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.11.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/09] | 22.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/52] | 11.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9619197 (ASTRA AB [SE], et al) [X] 9,10,31,33,34 * page 1, line 3 - line 4 * * page 2, line 11 - line 24 * * page 3, line 18 - line 19 * * examples 1h,1n,3h,3n * * claims 1,10-12,15,16,18-26,30,32,33,43-46 *; | [X]WO9831346 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [X] 1-9,11,12,16-30,32 * page 4, line 13 - page 6, line 23 * * page 11, line 12 - line 16 * * page 11, line 23 - page 13, line 2 * * page 22, line 13 - page 23, line 6 * * examples 3-14 * * claims 1-7,10-22,24-26,28-34,36 *; | [DX]WO9916421 (ALLIANCE PHARMA [US], et al) [DX] 1-34 * the whole document * * page 4, line 3 - page 8, line 29 * * page 17, line 1 - page 19, line 17 * * page 21, line 27 - line 33 * * page 25, line 19 - line 27 * * examples 3-8,10-12,15-17 * * claims 1,5-8,10-20,22-26,36-55 *; | [DX]WO9916422 (ALLIANCE PHARMA [US], et al) [DX] 1-34 * the whole document * * page 1, line 4 - line 8 * * page 3, line 21 - page 7, line 30 * * page 17, line 16 - page 18, line 4 * * page 18, line 19 - page 19, line 34 * * page 22, line 8 - line 14 * * page 26, line 5 - line 13 * * examples 3-7,9-16,18 * * claims 1-51 *; | [X]WO0000215 (ALLIANCE PHARMA [US], et al) [X] 1-34 * the whole document * * page 3, line 26 - page 7, line 10 * * page 10, line 32 - page 11, line 6 * * page 21, line 19 - page 24, line 25 * * page 38, line 6 - line 14 * * page 40, line 9 - line 17 * * examples 1-22 * * claims 1-50 *; | [PX]WO0185136 (ALLIANCE PHARMA [US]) [PX] 1-9,11-19,21-29,32 * the whole document * * page 4, line 1 - line 36 * * page 6, line 17 - page 7, line 4 * * page 8, line 1 - page 9, line 19 * * page 11, line 33 - page 12, line 2 * * page 12, line 18 - page 14, line 28 * * page 18, line 3 - line 14 * * examples 5,9,11,14-16 * * tables 4,5,10 * * claims 1-51 *; | [PX]WO0185137 (ALLIANCE PHARMA [US], et al) [PX] 1-9,11,12,16,18,19,21-29,32 * the whole document * * page 5, line 12 - page 10, line 13 * * examples 11,15 * * claims 1-45 *; | [X] - DELLAMARY L A ET AL, "HOLLOW POROUS PARTICLES IN METERED DOSE INHALERS", PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20000201), vol. 17, no. 2, ISSN 0724-8741, pages 168 - 174, XP009034216 [X] 1-9,11,12,16-18,21-28,32 * the whole document * * page 169, column L, line 25 - line 35 * * page 169, column L, line 47 - column R, line 9 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1007513213292 | International search | [X]WO8801862 ; | [X]US5985309 |