EP1356510 - WAFER SCALE BONDING OF PROTECTIVE CAPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/44] | WAFER SCALE MOLDING OF PROTECTIVE CAPS | ||
[2009/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Silverbrook Research Pty Limited 393 Darling Street Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2003/44] | For all designated states Silverbrook Research Pty. Limited 393 Darling Street Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SILVERBROOK, Kia Silverbrook Research Pty Ltd 393 Darling Street Balmain, New South Wales 2041 / AU | [2009/28] |
Former [2003/44] | 01 /
SILVERBROOK, Kia, Silverbrook Research Pty Ltd 393 Darling Street Balmain, New South Wales 2041 / AU | Representative(s) | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | ||
Former [2008/32] | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna, Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | ||
Former [2003/44] | McKeown, Yvonne Mary, et al c/o MacLachlan & Donaldson, 47 Merrion Square Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 02729352.1 | 08.01.2002 | [2003/44] | WO2002AU00008 | Priority number, date | AU2001PR02448 | 10.01.2001 Original published format: AU PR244801 | [2003/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02056367 | Date: | 18.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1356510 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1356510 | Date: | 08.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 18.07.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/822, H01L23/04 | [2003/44] | CPC: |
B81C1/00333 (EP,US);
B29C43/36 (EP,US);
H01L21/50 (EP,US);
B29C2035/0822 (EP,US);
B29C2043/503 (EP,US);
B29C33/0022 (EP,US);
B29C33/3842 (EP,US);
B81C2203/0109 (EP,US);
B81C2203/0127 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/1461, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEFESTIGEN VON SCHUTZKAPPEN AUF WAFER-EBENE | [2009/15] | English: | WAFER SCALE BONDING OF PROTECTIVE CAPS | [2009/15] | French: | FIXATION DE CAPUCHONS PROTECTEURS A L'ECHELLE DES PLAQUETTES | [2009/15] |
Former [2003/44] | FORMUNG VON SCHUTZKAPPEN AUF WAFER-MASSSTAB | ||
Former [2003/44] | WAFER SCALE MOLDING OF PROTECTIVE CAPS | ||
Former [2003/44] | MOULAGE A L'ECHELLE DES PLAQUETTES DE CAPUCHONS PROTECTEURS | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2003 | Search fee paid | 01.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 01.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/44] | 02.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.07.2009 | BE | 08.07.2009 | CY | 08.07.2009 | DK | 08.07.2009 | FI | 08.07.2009 | IT | 08.07.2009 | NL | 08.07.2009 | SE | 08.07.2009 | TR | 08.07.2009 | GR | 09.10.2009 | ES | 19.10.2009 | PT | 09.11.2009 | LU | 08.01.2010 | CH | 31.01.2010 | LI | 31.01.2010 | MC | 31.01.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
BE | 08.07.2009 | ||
CY | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
IT | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
GR | 09.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
LU | 08.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
BE | 08.07.2009 | ||
CY | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
IT | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
GR | 09.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
BE | 08.07.2009 | ||
CY | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
IT | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
GR | 09.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
BE | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
IT | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
GR | 09.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
BE | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
GR | 09.10.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/37] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
BE | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
BE | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
ES | 19.10.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19911916 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [A] 1* figures 2-4 *; | [X]DE10013067 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,10,11,17,24 * figures 1A-1E,2A * | International search | [X]DE19628237 ; | [A]JP2000277753 ; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 08, Database accession no. 1997-078741, XP002969727 & DE19628237 A 19970116 (NIPPON DENSO CO. LTD.) | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 16, Database accession no. 2001-150839, XP002969728 & JP2000277753 A 20001006 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD.) |