EP1352523 - METHOD FOR STORING ENCRYPTED DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nagracard S.A. 22, route de Genève 1033 Cheseaux-sur-Lausanne / CH | [2003/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NICOLAS, Christophe Rue de Lausanne 59 CH-1028 Préverenges / CH | [2003/42] | Representative(s) | Wenger, Joel-Théophile Leman Consulting S.A. Chemin de Précossy 31 1260 Nyon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/42] | Wenger, Joel-Théophile Leman Consulting S.A. 62 route de Clementy 1260 Nyon / CH | Application number, filing date | 02729493.3 | 15.01.2002 | [2003/42] | WO2002IB00106 | Priority number, date | CH20010000061 | 16.01.2001 Original published format: CH 612001 | [2003/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02056592 | Date: | 18.07.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1352523 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1352523 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/167 | [2003/42] | CPC: |
H04N5/913 (EP,US);
H04N21/6334 (KR);
H04N21/4331 (EP,US);
H04N21/4334 (EP,US);
H04N21/4408 (EP,US);
H04N7/163 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/42] | Extension states | AL | 16.06.2003 | LT | 16.06.2003 | LV | 16.06.2003 | MK | 16.06.2003 | RO | 16.06.2003 | SI | 16.06.2003 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SPEICHERN VERSCHLÜSSELTER DATEN | [2003/42] | English: | METHOD FOR STORING ENCRYPTED DATA | [2003/42] | French: | METHODE POUR STOCKER DES DONNEES ENCRYPTEES | [2003/42] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/42] | 18.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 04.11.2004 | CY | 15.01.2005 | LU | 15.01.2005 | MC | 31.01.2005 | [2007/20] |
Former [2007/11] | DK | 04.11.2004 | |
LU | 15.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | DK | 04.11.2004 | |
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/22] | DK | 04.11.2004 | Cited in | International search | [DA]FR2732537 (CANAL PLUS SA [FR]) [DA] 1,3* page 2, line 12 - line 26 *; | [A]EP0809402 (SCIENTIFIC ATLANTA [US]) [A] 2-4 * column 11, line 25 - line 29 *; | [DA]EP0912052 (CANAL PLUS SA [FR]) [DA] 1,2 * abstract * * column 10, line 35 - line 46; claim 1 *; | [X]WO0022777 (MITSUBISHI CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [PX]EP1122910 (MITSUBISHI CORP [JP]) [PX] 1 * abstract * * page 4, line 45 - line 46 * * page 5, line 36 - page 8, line 21 * * page 13, line 1 - line 2 * |