EP1393597 - THIOALUMINATE PHOSPHOR MATERIAL WITH A GADOLINIUM CO-ACTIVATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, FR | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states iFire Technology Corp. 10102-114 Street Fort Saskatchewan, Alberta T8L 3W4 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2005/52] | For all designated states iFire Technology Corp. 10102-114 Street Fort Saskatchewan Alberta T8L 3W4 / CA | ||
Former [2005/14] | For all designated states iFire Technology Corp. 10102-114 Street Fort Saskatchewan Alberta T8L 3W4 / CA | ||
Former [2004/10] | For all designated states iFire Technology Inc. 10102-114 Street Fort Saskatchewan Alberta T8L 3W4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKUA, Abdul, M. 4140 Bishopstoke Lane Mississauga, Ontario L4Z 1M5 / CA | 02 /
CHEONG, Dan, Daeweon 806 Crawford Mill Avenue Mississauga, Ontario L5W 1B5 / CA | [2004/13] |
Former [2004/10] | 01 /
CHEONG, Dan, Daeweon 806 Crawford Mill Avenue Mississauga, Ontario L5W 1B5 / CA | ||
02 /
NAKUA, Abdul, M. 4140 Bishopstoke Lane Mississauga, Ontario L4Z 1M5 / CA | Representative(s) | Amery, Marcus James, et al ZACCO GmbH Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/22] | Amery, Marcus James, et al Albihns GmbH Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/10] | Fenlon, Christine Lesley Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 02729686.2 | 07.05.2002 | [2004/10] | WO2002CA00690 | Priority number, date | US20010867806 | 30.05.2001 Original published format: US 867806 | [2004/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02098180 | Date: | 05.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1393597 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1393597 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/14, C09K11/84 | [2004/10] | CPC: |
H05B33/14 (EP,US);
C09K11/77 (KR);
C09K11/7767 (EP,US);
C09K11/7768 (EP,US);
C09K11/7784 (EP,US);
C09K11/7786 (EP,US);
C09K11/7792 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | THIOALUMINATES PHOSPHORMATERIAL MIT GADOLINIUM KOAKTIVATOR | [2004/10] | English: | THIOALUMINATE PHOSPHOR MATERIAL WITH A GADOLINIUM CO-ACTIVATOR | [2004/10] | French: | PHOSPHORE DE THIOALUMINATE PRESENTANT UN CO-ACTIVATEUR DE GADOLINIUM | [2004/10] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.12.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 25.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.12.2005 | BE | 28.12.2005 | CH | 28.12.2005 | CY | 28.12.2005 | FI | 28.12.2005 | FR | 28.12.2005 | IT | 28.12.2005 | LI | 28.12.2005 | NL | 28.12.2005 | TR | 28.12.2005 | DK | 28.03.2006 | GR | 28.03.2006 | SE | 28.03.2006 | DE | 29.03.2006 | ES | 08.04.2006 | LU | 07.05.2006 | IE | 08.05.2006 | PT | 29.05.2006 | MC | 31.05.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
IT | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
TR | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
DE | 29.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
LU | 07.05.2006 | ||
IE | 08.05.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
IT | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
DE | 29.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
IE | 08.05.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
DE | 29.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
IE | 08.05.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
DE | 29.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
MC | 31.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
DK | 28.03.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
DE | 29.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
PT | 29.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
NL | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
CH | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
LI | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
GR | 28.03.2006 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
BE | 28.12.2005 | ||
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 28.12.2005 | |
FI | 28.12.2005 | ||
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
ES | 08.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 28.12.2005 | |
SE | 28.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 28.12.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6025677 (MOSS III THOMAS S [US], et al) [A] 1,8,15 * column W *; | [AP]DE10028266 (PATENT TREUHAND GES FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUEHLAMPEN MBH [DE], et al) [AP] 1,8* the whole document *; | [AP]WO0223957 (IFIRE TECHNOLOGY INC [CA], et al) [AP] 1-14 * the whole document * |