EP1424077 - INSULIN-CONTAINING ORAL SPRAY AND THE PREPARATION METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/23] | ISULIN-CONTAINING ORAL SPRAY AND THE PREPARATION METHOD THEREOF | ||
[2008/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huazhong University of Science and Technology No. 1037 Luoyulu, Wuchang Wuhan Hubei Province 430074 / CN | For all designated states Hubei Huagong Biochemistry Eng. Co., Ltd. GuanShanKou S. No. 1 D018 Wuhan Hubei 430074 / CN | [2008/44] |
Former [2004/23] | For all designated states Huazhong University of Science and Technology No. 1037 Luoyulu, Wuchang Wuhan, Hubei Province 430074 / CN | ||
For all designated states Hubei Huagong Biochemistry Eng. Co., Ltd. GuanShanKou S. No. 1 D018 Wuhan, Hubei 430074 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Huibi 15the floor Gaoxin Tower, Luo Yu Road 272 Wuhan, Hubei 430074 / CN | 02 /
HUANG, Kaixun 15the floor Gaoxin Tower, Luo Yu Road 272 Wuhan, Hubei 430074 / CN | 03 /
GAO, Qiuhua 15the floor Gaoxin Tower,Luo Yu Road 272 Wuhan, Hubei 430074 / CN | 04 /
GAO, Zhonghong 15the floor Gaoxin Tower, Luo Yu Road 272 Wuhan, Hubei 430074 / CN | 05 /
YANG, Jilin 15the floor Gaoxin Tower, Luo Yu Road 272 Wuhan, Hubei 430074 / CN | [2004/41] |
Former [2004/23] | 01 /
XU, Huibi LuoYu Road 1037 Wuhan, Hubei 430074 / CN | ||
02 /
HUANG, Kaixun LuoYu Road 1037 Wuhan, Hubei 430074 / CN | |||
03 /
GAO, Qiuhua LuoYu Road 1037 Wuhan, Hubei 430074 / CN | |||
04 /
GAO, Zhonghong LuoYu Road 1037 Wuhan, Hubei 430074 / CN | |||
05 /
YANG, Jilin LuoYu Road 1037 Wuhan, Hubei 430074 / CN | Representative(s) | Vanhala, Jorma Kalevi, et al Berggren Oy Ab Kirkkokatu 9 90100 Oulu / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Vanhala, Jorma Kalevi, et al Berggren Oy Ab Kirkkokatu 9 90100 Oulu / FI | ||
Former [2004/23] | Risku, Ira Marjatta Berggren Oy Ab, P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 02729761.3 | 20.05.2002 | [2004/23] | WO2002CN00342 | Priority number, date | CN2001128323 | 08.08.2001 Original published format: CN 01128323 | [2004/23] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03013589 | Date: | 20.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1424077 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1424077 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 20.02.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/28, A61K9/12, A61K9/107 | [2007/19] | CPC: |
A61K9/006 (EP,US);
A61K38/28 (EP,US);
A61K9/1075 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/23] | A61K38/28, A61K9/107 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/23] | Title | German: | INSULIN-HALTIGES MUNDSPRAY UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2008/28] | English: | INSULIN-CONTAINING ORAL SPRAY AND THE PREPARATION METHOD THEREOF | [2008/28] | French: | SPRAY BUCCAL CONTENANT DE L'INSULINE ET PROCEDE DE PREPARATION CORRESPONDANT | [2004/23] |
Former [2004/23] | ISULIN-HALTIGES MUNDSPRAY UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2004/23] | ISULIN-CONTAINING ORAL SPRAY AND THE PREPARATION METHOD THEREOF | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2004 | Translation filed | 04.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2004 | Search fee paid | 04.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN | 04.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/23] | 18.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.10.2008 | BE | 29.10.2008 | CY | 29.10.2008 | DK | 29.10.2008 | FI | 29.10.2008 | IT | 29.10.2008 | NL | 29.10.2008 | TR | 29.10.2008 | GR | 30.01.2009 | ES | 09.02.2009 | PT | 30.03.2009 | IE | 20.05.2009 | LU | 20.05.2009 | CH | 31.05.2009 | LI | 31.05.2009 | MC | 31.05.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
IT | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
GR | 30.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
IE | 20.05.2009 | ||
LU | 20.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
IT | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
GR | 30.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
IE | 20.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
IT | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
IE | 20.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
IT | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.05.2009 | ||
LI | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
IT | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
IT | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 09.02.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5164184 (KIM YOUNG S [KR]) [Y] 4,7 * column 2, line 34 - line 55; claim - *; | [Y]WO0018371 (GENEREX PHARM INC [CA], et al) [Y] 1-11 * page 17, line 23 - page 18, line 1; claim - * * page 14, line 9 - line 21 *; | [Y]WO0021577 (NYCOMED IMAGING AS [NO], et al) [Y] 1-11* example 5 *; | [X]US6191105 (EKWURIBE NNOCHIRI NKEM [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * column 9, line 5 - line 12; claim - * * column 13, line 30 - line 35 * * column 30, line 23 - line 27 *; | [Y]DE19940227 (MERCKLE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-11 * page 3, line 50 - line 53; example - * * page 4, line 7 - line 11; examples 1,4; claims 14-17 *; | [Y] - PATKI V P ET AL, "PROGRESS MADE IN NON-INVASIVE INSULIN DELIVERY", INDIAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, XX, XX, (1996), vol. 28, no. 3, ISSN 0253-7613, pages 143 - 151, XP009081035 [Y] 1-11 * page 145, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 2 * | [A] - SAYANI A P ET AL, "SYSTEMIC DELIVERY OF PEPTIDES AND PROTEINS ACROSS ABSORPTIVE MUCOSAE", CRITICAL REVIEWS IN THERAPEUTIC DRUG CARRIER SYSTEMS, (1996), vol. 13, no. 1/2, ISSN 0743-4863, pages 85 - 184, XP000867488 [A] * the whole document * | [T] - XU HUI-BI ET AL, "Hypoglycaemic effect of a novel insulin buccal formulation on rabbits.", PHARMACOLOGICAL RESEARCH, (200211), vol. 46, no. 5, ISSN 1043-6618, pages 459 - 467, XP002427259 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1043661802002049 | International search | [A]CN1264596 (HUAZHONG SCIENCE & ENGINEERING [CN]); | [A]US6221378 (MODI PANKAJ [CA]) |