EP1380072 - ELECTRIC CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2019 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2011/38] |
Former [2004/03] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOPP, Rainer Moselstrasse 61 72768 Reutlingen / DE | 02 /
HENKEL, Achim Koenigstraessle 103 72766 Reutlingen / DE | 03 /
MILICH, Reinhard Bruehlstrasse 74/1 72770 Reutlingen / DE | [2004/03] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/38] | Application number, filing date | 02729827.2 | 28.03.2002 | [2004/03] | WO2002DE01135 | Priority number, date | DE20011017798 | 10.04.2001 Original published format: DE 10117798 | [2004/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02084806 | Date: | 24.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1380072 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1380072 | Date: | 21.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01R9/24 | [2004/03] | CPC: |
H01R29/00 (EP,US);
H01R9/2458 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [2011/38] |
Former [2004/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHER STECKVERBINDER | [2004/03] | English: | ELECTRIC CONNECTOR | [2004/03] | French: | CONNECTEUR ELECTRIQUE | [2004/03] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/03] | 20.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 01.01.2012 | [2019/40] |
Former [2013/22] | ES | 01.01.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5587890 (HAPP LAWRENCE R [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * column 3, line 17 - column 8, line 65 *; | [X]WO9809486 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,8-10 * page 2, line 23 - page 7, line 30 * | by applicant | US5587890 | WO9809486 |