EP1367894 - ANTIMICROBIAL COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Janssen Pharmaceutica NV Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [2008/21] |
Former [2003/50] | For all designated states JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA N.V. Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHNISHI, Toshimasa, Nagase ChemteX Corporation 236, Nakai, Tatsuno-cho Tatsuno-shi, Tatsuno, Hyogo 679-4124 / JP | 02 /
TANAKA, Ikuya, Nagase ChemteX Corporation 236, Nakai, Tatsuno-cho Tatsuno-shi, Tatsuno, Hyogo 679-4124 / JP | [2003/50] | Application number, filing date | 02729958.5 | 04.03.2002 | [2003/50] | WO2002EP02368 | Priority number, date | JP20010061158 | 06.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001061158 | [2003/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02076209 | Date: | 03.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1367894 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1367894 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/88 | [2003/50] | CPC: |
A01N43/88 (EP,KR,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/88, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N43/88, A01N59/20, A01N59/16, A01N47/12, A01N47/04, A01N43/88, A01N43/80, A01N43/70, A01N43/40, A01N37/34, A01N31/16 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 06.10.2003 | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTIMIKROBIELLE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2003/50] | English: | ANTIMICROBIAL COMPOSITIONS | [2003/50] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ANTIMICROBIENNES | [2003/50] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.10.2003 | Examination requested [2003/50] | 21.11.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.05.2008 | CY | 21.05.2008 | FI | 21.05.2008 | TR | 21.05.2008 | PT | 21.10.2008 | [2011/43] |
Former [2009/12] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
FI | 21.05.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2000053510 ; | [Y]JP2000302601 ; | [Y]JPH11217308 ; | [X]US5712275 (VAN GESTEL JOZEF FRANS ELIZABE [BE]) [X] 1,2,8-10 * column 1, line 36 - column 3, line 6 * * column 6, line 22 - line 67 *; | [Y]WO9918795 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE], et al) [Y] 1-10 * examples 1,2 *; | [Y]WO0032371 (HICKSON INT PLC [GB], et al) [Y] 1-10 * page 13, line 1 - line 22 * * examples 1,14 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2000, no. 31, Database accession no. 2000-353247, XP002214716 & JP2000053510 A 20000222 (TAKEDA CHEM IND LTD) [X] 1-10 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 21, Database accession no. 2001-204919, XP002220737 & JP2000302601 A 20001031 (TAKEDA CHEM IND LTD) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1999, no. 42, Database accession no. 1999-502348, XP002220738 & JPH11217308 A 19990810 (TAKEDA CHEM IND LTD) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * |