EP1379790 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A STRUCTURAL MEMBER COMPRISING A METAL SHEET AND A SET SCREW AND STRUCTURAL MEMBER. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/03] | METHOD FOR FIXING A FUNCTIONAL ELEMENT IN THE FORM OF SET SCREW INTO A SHEET-METAL PART | ||
[2004/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2006 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.06.2006 [2006/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Profil Verbindungstechnik GmbH & Co. KG Otto-Hahn-Strasse 22-24 61381 Friedrichsdorf / DE | [2006/17] |
Former [2004/03] | For all designated states Profil Verbindungstechnik GmbH & Co. KG Otto-Hahn-Strasse 22-24 61381 Friedrichsdorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOESSRICH, Wolfgang Höhenstrasse 15 61476 Kronberg / DE | [2004/03] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/03] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02730096.1 | 03.04.2002 | [2004/03] | WO2002EP03696 | Priority number, date | DE20011018973 | 18.04.2001 Original published format: DE 10118973 | [2004/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02084131 | Date: | 24.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1379790 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1379790 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16B35/04, F16B17/00 | [2004/03] | CPC: |
B23P19/062 (EP);
F16B17/006 (EP);
F16B37/068 (EP);
F16B35/044 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2004/52] |
Former [2004/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ZUSAMMENBAUTEILS BESTEHEND AUS EINEM BLECHTEIL UND EINEM GEWINDESTIFT SOWIE ZUSAMMENBAUTEIL. | [2004/51] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A STRUCTURAL MEMBER COMPRISING A METAL SHEET AND A SET SCREW AND STRUCTURAL MEMBER. | [2004/51] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN ELEMENT DE CONSTRUCTION COMPRENANT UNE PARTIE EN TOLE ET UNE TIGE FILETEE AINSI QUE L'ELEMENT DE CONSTRUCTION. | [2004/51] |
Former [2004/03] | VERFAHREN ZUM ANBRINGEN EINES FUNKTIONSELEMENTS IN FORM EINES GEWINDESTIFTS IN EIN BLECHTEIL | ||
Former [2004/03] | METHOD FOR FIXING A FUNCTIONAL ELEMENT IN THE FORM OF SET SCREW INTO A SHEET-METAL PART | ||
Former [2004/03] | PROCEDE POUR PLACER UN ELEMENT FONCTIONNEL SOUS FORME DE TIGE FILETEE DANS UN ELEMENT EN TOLE | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/03] | 21.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]WO0231278 (WEEKS PEACOCK QUALITY HOMES [AU], et al) [X] 1,3,4,13,14,16 * page 4, line 14 - line 22 * [A] 6-12,17,18 [Y] 2,5,15; | [XAY]DE3213733 (KNORR BREMSE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,13,14,16 * page 8, line 35 * * page 9, line 1 - line 18 * [A] 5,6,8-12,17,18 [Y] 2,7,15; | [YA]JPH06226376 ; | [YA]US5797175 (SCHNEIDER WILHELM [DE]) [Y] 5 * figure 5 * [A] 1-4,6-18; | [YA]EP0477517 (VSI CORP [US]) [Y] 2,15 * abstract * [A] 1,3-14,16-18; | [A]EP0171348 (REXNORD INC [US]) [A] 1-18 * figures 6,7 *; | [A]US3060562 (LEONARD FRANSSON GEORG) [A] 1-18 * figures 1,2 * | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941115), vol. 018, no. 598, Database accession no. (M - 1704), & JP06226376 A 19940816 (KITAURA KOGYO KK) [Y] 7 * abstract * [A] 1-6,8-18 |