EP1399776 - SPRING HINGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.12.2009 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 24.02.2010 [2010/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OBE Ohnmacht & Baumgärtner GmbH & Co. KG Turnstrasse 22 75228 Ispringen / DE | [2009/08] |
Former [2004/13] | For all designated states OBE Ohnmacht & Baumgärtner GmbH & Co. KG Turnstrasse 22 75228 Ispringen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAGNER, Reiner Turnstrasse 22a 75228 Ispringen / DE | [2004/13] | Representative(s) | Gleiss, Alf-Olav, et al Gleiss Grosse Schrell und Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstrasse 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Gleiss, Alf-Olav, et al Gleiss Grosse Schrell & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstrasse 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2004/13] | Gleiss, Alf-Olav, Dipl.-Ing., et al Gleiss & Grosse Leitzstrasse 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 02730128.2 | 09.04.2002 | [2004/13] | WO2002EP03899 | Priority number, date | DE2001128383 | 06.06.2001 Original published format: DE 10128383 | [2004/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02099512 | Date: | 12.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1399776 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1399776 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G02C5/22 | [2004/13] | CPC: |
G02C5/2236 (EP,US);
G02C5/22 (KR);
G02C2200/06 (EP);
G02C2200/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [2009/08] |
Former [2004/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | FEDERSCHARNIER | [2004/13] | English: | SPRING HINGE | [2004/13] | French: | CHARNIERE A RESSORT | [2004/13] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/13] | 25.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 30.04.2009 | LI | 30.04.2009 | [2010/08] | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0679920 (OBE WERK KG [DE]) [A] 1,6,8 * column 1, line 32 - column 2, line 7 * * column 3, line 23 - column 4, line 21 * * column 7, line 16 - line 39 *; | [A]FR2719913 (CHEVASSUS [FR]) [A] 1* page 4, line 6 - line 31 *; | [A]DE19856117 (PARK BOO GWANG [KR]) [A] 1 * column 1 - column 3, line 19 *; | [A]FR2793323 (VEUVE HENRI CHEVASSUS SOC [FR]) [A] 1 * page 6 - page 7 *; | [A]WO0104689 (VISOTTICA SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1,8 * page 2, line 2 - page 4, line 4 * |