EP1394458 - JOINT FOR HIGH PRESSURE FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.03.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 26.11.2008 [2008/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Karasawa Fine Co., Ltd. 3-27 Ohaza-Minamiakano Saitama-shi Saitama 330-0826 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | For all designated states Karasawa Fine Co., Ltd. 3-27 Ohaza-Minamiakano Saitama-shi, Saitama 330-0826 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARASAWA, Yukihiko 3-27 Oh aza Minaminakano Saitama-shi, Saitama 330-0826 / JP | [2004/10] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/48] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/10] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner GbR Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02730763.6 | 29.05.2002 | [2004/10] | WO2002JP05240 | Priority number, date | JP20010168292 | 04.06.2001 Original published format: JP 2001168292 | [2004/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02099327 | Date: | 12.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1394458 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.12.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16L19/00, F16L19/02 | [2004/44] | CPC: |
F16L19/0206 (EP,US);
F16L15/08 (EP,US);
F16L19/0231 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/10] | F16L19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KUPPLUNG FÜR HOCHDRUCKFLUID | [2004/10] | English: | JOINT FOR HIGH PRESSURE FLUID | [2004/10] | French: | RACCORD POUR FLUIDE HAUTE PRESSION | [2004/10] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2003 | Translation filed | 23.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2003 | Search fee paid | 23.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 04.03.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB931817 (ICI LTD) [X] 1 * figure - * [A] 2-4; | [X]DE1600474 (GLUTZ BLOTZHEIM NACHFOLGER AG) [X] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US3430990 (NELSON DONALD R) [A] 1-4 * figure - *; | [A]NL268571 (SHELL INTERNATIONAL RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ N.V.) [A] 2,3 * figure - * | International search | [X]JPH11325341 (SAKURA RUBBER); | [X]JPS6012786U ; | [X]JPS6314084U ; | [Y]JPH04132288U |