EP1403912 - METHOD OF PRODUCING III NITRIDE COMPOUND SEMICONDUCTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.2013 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYODA GOSEI CO., LTD. 1, Aza-Nagahata, Ohaza-ochiai, Haruhi-cho Nishikasugai-gun Aichi 452-8564 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/14] | For all designated states Toyoda Gosei Co., Ltd. 1, Aza-Nagahata, Ohaza-ochiai, Haruhi-cho Nishikasugai-gun, Aichi 452-8564 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATO, Hisaki, TOYODA GOSEI CO., LTD. 1, Aza Nagahata, Oaza Ochiai, Haruhi-cho Nishikasugai-gun, Aichi 452-8564 / JP | 02 /
ASAI, Makoto, TOYODA GOSEI CO., LTD. 1, Aza Nagahata, Oaza Ochiai, Haruhi-cho Nishikasugai-gun, Aichi 452-8564 / JP | 03 /
KANEYAMA, Naoki, TOYODA GOSEI CO., LTD. 1, Aza Nagahata, Oaza Ochiai, Haruhi-cho Nishikasugai-gun, Aichi 452-8564 / JP | 04 /
SAWAZAKI, Katsuhisa, TOYODA GOSEI CO., LTD. 1, Aza Nagahata, Oaza Ochiai, Haruhi-cho Nishikasugai-gun, Aichi 452-8564 / JP | [2004/14] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/14] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02730885.7 | 03.06.2002 | [2004/14] | WO2002JP05446 | Priority number, date | JP20010168015 | 04.06.2001 Original published format: JP 2001168015 | JP20010168016 | 04.06.2001 Original published format: JP 2001168016 | JP20020147130 | 22.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002147130 | [2004/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02099859 | Date: | 12.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1403912 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.12.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/20, H01L21/205 | [2009/35] | CPC: |
H01L21/0262 (EP,US);
H01L21/0237 (EP,US);
H01L21/0242 (EP,US);
H01L21/02458 (EP,US);
H01L21/02502 (EP,US);
H01L21/0254 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/14] | H01L21/205 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ZUSAMMENGESETZTEN III-NITRID-HALBLEITERS | [2004/14] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING III NITRIDE COMPOUND SEMICONDUCTOR | [2004/14] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN SEMICONDUCTEUR AU NITRURE III | [2004/14] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2003 | Translation filed | 03.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2003 | Search fee paid | 03.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 03.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/14] | 15.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/03] | 11.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.11.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2013 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2000150959 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1-3,6,7 * abstract *; | [X]EP1059677 (PIONEER CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,6,7,14 * paragraphs [0016] - [0023] - [0037]; figure 1; claim - *; | [E]EP1241702 (TOYODA GOSEI KK [JP]) [E] 1-7,14* paragraphs [0030] - [0036] - [0053]; figures 3,4 * | International search | [X]JP2000150959 (HITACHI LTD); | [X]JP2000261106 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [X]EP1059677 (PIONEER CORP [JP]); | [X]JPH1131864 (NEC CORP); | [A]US6365921 (WATANABE ATSUSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US6329667 (OTA HIROYUKI [JP], et al); | [AE]WO02058120 (SONY CORP [JP], et al) | by applicant | EP1059677 | JP2000150959 | EP1241702 | JP2000261106 | JPH1131864 | US6365921 | US6329667 |