EP1397224 - FIXATION DEVICE FOR A PORTABLE ORBITAL DRILLING UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2009 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novator AB Stormbyvägen 6 163 55 Spaanga / SE | [2004/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETTERSSON, Björn Morkullevägen 44 S-175 64 JÄRFÄLLA / SE | 02 /
WIKLUND, Marcus Lyckselevägen 3 S-162 67 VÄLLINGBY / SE | [2004/12] | Representative(s) | Winblad, Hans Peter, et al Albihns AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/12] | Winblad, Hans Peter, et al Albihns Stockholm AB, Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 02731066.3 | 17.06.2002 | [2004/12] | WO2002SE01164 | Priority number, date | US20010299007P | 18.06.2001 Original published format: US 299007 P | [2004/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02102535 | Date: | 27.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1397224 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1397224 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 27.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B23B35/00, B23C3/00 | [2004/12] | CPC: |
B23Q16/021 (EP,US);
B23B49/02 (EP,US);
B23Q11/0046 (EP,US);
B23Q35/00 (EP,US);
Y10T408/56245 (EP,US);
Y10T408/56253 (EP,US);
Y10T409/303696 (EP,US);
Y10T409/303808 (EP,US);
Y10T409/304424 (EP,US);
Y10T409/306384 (EP,US);
Y10T409/307112 (EP,US);
Y10T409/307616 (EP,US);
Y10T82/125 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEFESTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE TRAGBARE EINHEIT ZUM BOHREN AUF EINER KREISFÖRMIGEN BAHN | [2004/12] | English: | FIXATION DEVICE FOR A PORTABLE ORBITAL DRILLING UNIT | [2004/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION POUR UNE UNITE DE PERCAGE ORBITAL PORTATIVE | [2004/12] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 10.12.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/12] | 16.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.04.2008 | BE | 09.04.2008 | CY | 09.04.2008 | DK | 09.04.2008 | FI | 09.04.2008 | NL | 09.04.2008 | TR | 09.04.2008 | IE | 17.06.2008 | LU | 17.06.2008 | CH | 30.06.2008 | LI | 30.06.2008 | MC | 30.06.2008 | SE | 09.07.2008 | GR | 10.07.2008 | PT | 09.09.2008 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
CY | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
TR | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 17.06.2008 | ||
LU | 17.06.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
CY | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 17.06.2008 | ||
LU | 17.06.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/42] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
CY | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 17.06.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/30] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 17.06.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 17.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3981226 (WHITE KENNETH N); | [Y]EP0447620 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]); | [X]US5088171 (SUZUKI TAKASHI [JP]); | [X]WO9417944 (STRUKTURTEKNOLOGIER I STOCKHOL [SE], et al); | [A]DE19934615 (STEYER RALF [DE]); | [Y]WO0115870 (NOVATOR AB [SE]) |