EP1390075 - CHEMOTHERAPEUTIC INDUCTION OF EGR-1 PROMOTER ACTIVITY IN GENE THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/09] | CHEMOTHERAPEUTIC INDUCTION OF EGR-1 PROMOTER ACTIVITY | ||
[2011/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.11.2012 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University of Chicago 5640 South Ellis Avenue, Suite 405 Chicago, IL 60637 / US | For all designated states DANA-FARBER CANCER INSTITUTE 44 Binney Street Boston, MA 02115 / US | [2012/03] |
Former [2005/46] | For all designated states The University of Chicago 5640 South Ellis Avenue, Suite 405 Chicago, IL 60637 / US | ||
For all designated states DANA-FARBER CANCER INSTITUTE 44 Binney Street Boston, MA 02115 / US | |||
Former [2004/09] | For all designated states The University of Chicago 5640 South Ellis Avenue, Suite 405 Chicago, IL 60637 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEICHSELBAUM, Ralph, R. 1909 North Burling Chicago, IL 60614 / US | 02 /
KUFE, Donald, W. 179 Grove Street Wellesley, MA 02181 / US | 03 /
GUPTA, Vinay 1637 West Altgeld Chicago, IL 60637 / US | 04 /
MAUCERI, Helen 2046 Burnham Place Wheaton. IL 60187 / US | 05 /
PARK, James 526 E. 32nd ST. Unit E Chicago, IL 60616 / US | 06 /
POSNER, Mitchell 442 W. Wellington 6W Chicago, IL 60657 / US | [2004/09] | Representative(s) | Kremer, Simon Mark, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | Kremer, Simon Mark, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [2004/09] | Fisher, Adrian John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02731264.4 | 05.04.2002 | [2004/09] | WO2002US10733 | Priority number, date | US20010282040P | 06.04.2001 Original published format: US 282040 P | [2004/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02080849 | Date: | 17.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1390075 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1390075 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.02.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/67, C12N15/861, A61K48/00, C12N15/00, C12N15/09, C12N15/63, C12N15/85, C07H21/00, A61P35/04 | [2007/38] | CPC: |
A61K48/0066 (EP,US);
A61K38/191 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K48/0058 (EP,US);
A61K48/0083 (EP,US);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K14/4702 (EP,US);
C12N15/67 (EP,US);
C12N15/85 (EP,US);
C12N15/86 (EP,US);
C12N7/00 (EP,US);
A61K48/00 (EP,US);
C12N2710/10343 (EP,US);
C12N2830/002 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/09] | A61K48/00, C12N15/00, C12N15/09, C12N15/63, C12N15/85, C07H21/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/09] | Title | German: | CHEMOTHERAPEUTISCHE EINLEITUNG DER EGR-1-PROMOTER-AKTIVITÄT IN GENTHERAPIE | [2011/26] | English: | CHEMOTHERAPEUTIC INDUCTION OF EGR-1 PROMOTER ACTIVITY IN GENE THERAPY | [2011/26] | French: | INDUCTION CHIMIOTHERAPEUTIQUE DE L'ACTIVITE DU PROMOTEUR EGR-1 DANS LA THERAPIE GENIQUE | [2011/26] |
Former [2004/09] | CHEMOTHERAPEUTISCHE EINLEITUNG DER EGR-1-PROMOTER-AKTIVITÄT | ||
Former [2004/09] | CHEMOTHERAPEUTIC INDUCTION OF EGR-1 PROMOTER ACTIVITY | ||
Former [2004/09] | INDUCTION CHIMIOTHERAPEUTIQUE DE L'ACTIVITE DU PROMOTEUR EGR-1 | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2003 | Search fee paid | 05.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 05.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/09] | 07.01.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 29.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.07.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 29.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.01.2008 | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.01.2012 | BE | 18.01.2012 | CY | 18.01.2012 | DK | 18.01.2012 | FI | 18.01.2012 | NL | 18.01.2012 | SE | 18.01.2012 | TR | 18.01.2012 | IE | 05.04.2012 | LU | 05.04.2012 | GR | 19.04.2012 | CH | 30.04.2012 | LI | 30.04.2012 | MC | 30.04.2012 | PT | 18.05.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 18.01.2012 | |
BE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
TR | 18.01.2012 | ||
IE | 05.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 18.01.2012 | |
BE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
IE | 05.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 18.01.2012 | |
BE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | BE | 18.01.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [T] - PARK JAMES O ET AL, "Transcriptional control of viral gene therapy by cisplatin", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, (200208), vol. 110, no. 3, ISSN 0021-9738, pages 403 - 410, XP002446418 [T] 1-40 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI200215548 | [Y] - DATTA RAKESH ET AL, "Reactive oxygen intermediates target CC(A/T)-6GG sequences to mediate activation of the early growth response 1 transcription factor gene by ionizing radiation", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (1993), vol. 90, no. 6, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 2419 - 2422, XP002446419 [Y] 1-40 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.90.6.2419 | [Y] - OHBA MOTOI ET AL, "Production of hydrogen peroxide by transforming growth factor-beta-1 and its involvement in induction of egr-1 in mouse osteoblastic cells", JOURNAL OF CELL BIOLOGY, (1994), vol. 126, no. 4, ISSN 0021-9525, pages 1079 - 1088, XP002446420 [Y] 1-40 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1083/jcb.126.4.1079 | [XY] - JOKI TATSUHIRO ET AL, "Modification of Doxorubicin molecule enhanced the early growth response gene 1 promoter activity", JIKEIKAI MEDICAL JOURNAL, (1996), vol. 43, no. 1, ISSN 0021-6968, pages 1 - 7, XP009088101 [X] 40 * the whole document * [Y] 1-39 | [XY] - ARAI MASASHI ET AL, "Mechanism of doxorubicin-induced inhibition of sarcoplasmic reticulum Ca2+-ATPase gene transcription", CIRCULATION RESEARCH, (20000107), vol. 86, no. 1, ISSN 0009-7330, pages 8 - 14, XP002446421 [X] 40 * the whole document * [Y] 1-39 | [Y] - DOROSHOW J H, "PREVENTION OF DOXORUBICIN-INDUCED KILLING OF MCF-7 HUMAN BREAST CANCER CELLS BY OXYGEN RADICAL SCAVENGERS AND IRON CHELATING AGENTS", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (1986), vol. 135, no. 1, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 330 - 335, XP009088114 [Y] 1-40 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-291X(86)90981-2 | [Y] - SODHI A ET AL, "INCREASED RELEASE OF HYDROGEN PEROXIDE AND SUPEROXIDE ANION BY MURINE MACROPHAGES IN-VITRO AFTER CISPLATIN TREATMENT", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF IMMUNOPHARMACOLOGY, (1986), vol. 8, no. 7, ISSN 0192-0561, pages 709 - 714, XP002446422 [Y] 1-40 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0192-0561(86)90006-8 | [Y] - SULKOWSKA MARIOLA ET AL, "Cyclophosphamide-induced generation of reactive oxygen species. Comparison with morphological changes in type II alveolar epithelial cells and lung capillaries", EXPERIMENTAL AND TOXICOLOGIC PATHOLOGY, (199806), vol. 50, no. 3, ISSN 0940-2993, pages 209 - 220, XP009088115 [Y] 1-40 * the whole document * | [Y] - UETA EISAKU ET AL, "Manganese superoxide dismutase negatively regulates the induction of apoptosis by 5-fluorouracil, peplomycin and gamma-Rays in squamous cell carcinoma cells", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF CANCER RESEARCH, (199905), vol. 90, no. 5, ISSN 0910-5050, pages 555 - 564, XP009088120 [Y] 1-40 * the whole document * | [Y] - VAN DER DONK WILFRED A ET AL, "Detection of a new substrate-derived radical during inactivation of ribonucleotide reductase from Escherichia coli by gemcitabine 5'-diphosphate", BIOCHEMISTRY, (19980505), vol. 37, no. 18, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 6419 - 6426, XP002446423 [Y] 1-40 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi9729357 | [A] - BONAVIDA B ET AL, "SYNERGY IS DOCUMENTED IN-VITRO WITH LOW-DOSE RECOMBINANT TUMOR NECROSIS FACTOR CISPLATIN AND DOXORUBICIN IN OVARIAN CANCER CELLS", GYNECOLOGIC ONCOLOGY, (1990), vol. 38, no. 3, ISSN 0090-8258, pages 333 - 339, XP002446424 [A] 1-40 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0090-8258(90)90068-V | International search | [X] - SEUNG ET AL., "Genetic radiotherapy overcomes tumor resistance to cytotoxic agents", CANCER RESEARCH, (19951201), vol. 55, pages 5561 - 5565, XP002955986 | [X] - WEICHSELBAUM ET AL., "Gene therapy targeted by radiation preferentially radiosensitizes tumor cells", CANCER RESEARCH, (19940815), vol. 54, pages 4266 - 4269, XP002932030 | [X] - STABA ET AL., "Adenoviral TNF-alpha gene therapy and radiation damage tumor vasculature in a human malignant glioma xenograft", GENE THERAPY, (199803), vol. 5, pages 293 - 300, XP002955980 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.gt.3300594 | [X] - MAUCERI ET AL., "Tumor necrosis factor alpha (TNF-alpha) gene therapy targeted by ionizing radiation selectively damages tumor vasculature", CANCER RESEARCH, (19961001), vol. 54, pages 4311 - 4314, XP002936211 | [A] - CARUSO M., "Gene therapy against cancer and HIV infection using the gene encoding herpes simplex virus thymidine kinase", MOLECULAR MEDICINE TODAY, (199605), vol. 1, pages 212 - 217, XP000670302 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/1357-4310(96)88774-0 | [A] - HARBOUR ET AL., "Rb function in cell-cycle regulation and apoptosis", NATURE CELL BIOLOGY, (200004), vol. 2, pages E65 - E67, XP002955774 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35008695 | [A] - KREITMAN ET AL., "Targeting pseudomonas exotoxin to hematologic malignancies", CANCER BIOLOGY, (1995), vol. 6, pages 297 - 306, XP002955775 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/scbi.1995.0038 | [A] - PEREZ R.P., "Cellular and molecular determinants of cisplatin resistance", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CANCER, (1998), vol. 34, no. 10, pages 1535 - 1542, XP004285043 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0959-8049(98)00227-5 | [A] - SARTORIUS ET AL., "Molecular mechanisms of death-receptor-mediated apoptosis", CHEMBIOCHEM., (2001), vol. 2, pages 20 - 29, XP002955776 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1439-7633(20010105)2:1<20::AID-CBIC20>3.0.CO;2-X | [A] - GONZALEZ ET AL., "Is cisplatin-induced cell death always produced by apoptosis?", MOLECULAR PHARMOCOLOGY, (2001), vol. 59, pages 657 - 663, XP002955777 | Examination | - MYERS C, "The role of iron in doxorubicin-induced cardiomyopathy.", SEMINARS IN ONCOLOGY AUG 1998 LNKD- PUBMED:9768818, (199808), vol. 25, no. 4 Suppl 10, ISSN 0093-7754, pages 10 - 14 |