EP1388228 - MUSIC DISTRIBUTION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ochoa Optics LLC 2215-B Renaissance Drive, Suite 5 Las Vegas, NV 89119 / US | [2009/38] |
Former [2004/07] | For all designated states World Theatre, Inc. One Copley Parkway, Suite 302 Morrisville, NC 27560 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALLOU, Bernard L. Jr. 11404 Blackbrook Court Raleigh, NC 27614 / US | 02 /
SPARKS, Kelly C. 5124 Killarney Hope Dr. Raleigh, NC 27613 / US | 03 /
HEBRANK, John, H. 216 Jefferson Drive Durham, NC 27712 / US | 04 /
HUNTER, Charles, Eric 7 Grey Widgeon Hilton Head Island, SC 29928 / US | [2004/14] |
Former [2004/07] | 01 /
BALLOU, Bernard L. Jr. 11404 Blackbrook Court Raleigh, NC 27614 / US | ||
02 /
SPARKS, Kelly C. 900 Perimeter Park Drive, Suite E Morrisville, NC 27560 / US | |||
03 /
HEBRANK, John, H. 216 Jefferson Drive Durham, NC 27712 / US | |||
04 /
HUNTER, Charles, Eric 7 Grey Widgeon Hilton Head Island, SC 29928 / US | Representative(s) | Ablett, Graham Keith, et al Ablett & Stebbing 7-8 Market Place London, W1W 8AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/21] | Ablett, Graham Keith, et al Ablett & Stebbing Caparo House 101-103 Baker Street London, W1U 6FQ / GB | ||
Former [2004/07] | Lawrence, Malcolm Graham, et al Hepworth, Lawrence, Bryer & Bizley Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02731779.1 | 14.05.2002 | [2004/07] | WO2002US15126 | Priority number, date | US20010855992 | 15.05.2001 Original published format: US 855992 | [2004/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02093798 | Date: | 21.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1388228 | Date: | 11.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.11.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04H60/06, H04H60/17, H04H60/21, H04H60/27, H04H60/63, H04H60/65, H04H20/40, // H04H20/08, H04H20/16, H04H20/31, H04H20/74, H04H60/11, H04H60/18, H04H60/22, H04H60/23, H04H60/33, H04H60/98 | [2017/11] | CPC: |
G06Q20/1235 (EP,US);
G06Q30/06 (EP,US);
G07F17/0014 (EP,US);
G11B27/031 (EP,US);
H04H20/40 (EP,US);
H04H60/06 (EP,US);
H04H60/17 (EP,US);
H04H60/21 (EP,US);
H04H60/27 (EP,US);
H04H60/63 (EP,US);
H04H60/65 (EP,US);
H04N21/2543 (EP,US);
H04N21/262 (EP,US);
H04N21/44204 (EP,US);
H04N21/472 (EP,US);
H04N21/6143 (EP,US);
H04N21/63345 (EP,US);
H04N21/8106 (EP,US);
H04N21/8113 (EP,US);
H04N21/8355 (EP,US);
H04N7/165 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2529 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2545 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2562 (EP,US);
G11B2220/41 (EP,US);
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
H04H20/08 (EP,US);
H04H20/16 (EP,US);
H04H20/31 (EP,US);
H04H20/74 (EP,US);
H04H2201/50 (EP,US);
H04H60/11 (EP,US);
H04H60/18 (EP,US);
H04H60/22 (EP,US);
H04H60/23 (EP,US);
H04H60/33 (EP,US);
H04H60/98 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/07] | H04H1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/07] | Title | German: | MUSIKVERTEILUNGSSYSTEME | [2004/07] | English: | MUSIC DISTRIBUTION SYSTEMS | [2004/07] | French: | SYSTEMES DE DISTRIBUTION DE MUSIQUE | [2004/07] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2003 | Search fee paid | 14.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/07] | 09.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.02.2017 | 01.02.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 26.10.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.11.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 06.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/28] | 05.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/28] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.04.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 07.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 05.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4789863 (BUSH THOMAS A [US]) [Y] 11 * column 5, lines 44-52 *; | [Y]US5721827 (LOGAN JAMES [US], et al) [Y] 16,17 * column 5, lines 9-19 * * column 5, lines 31-36 * * column 6, lines 1-5 * * column 8, lines 1-10 * * column 27, lines 13-36 *; | [Y]US5900608 (IIDA TAKAHITO [JP]) [Y] 18 * column 29, line 63 - column 30, line 52; figure 31 *; | [Y]US5986690 (HENDRICKS JOHN S [US]) [Y] 23,25 * column 8, line 60 - column 9, line 11 ** column 16, lines 58-67 *; | [XY]WO0117242 (WORLD THEATRE INC [US]) [X] 1-10,12-15,19,28 * page 9, lines 1-19 * * page 16, lines 14-20 * * page 29, lines 13-16 * * page 33, lines 6-10 * * page 33, lines 18,19 * * page 34, line 7 - page 35, line 2 * * page 35, lines 10-19 * * page 36, lines 3-14 * * page 36, line 22 - page 37, line 24 * * page 38, line 15 - page 39, line 2; figure 11 * [Y] 11,16-18,23,25 | International search | [XP]US2002056118 ; | [XE]US2002062261 ; | [AE]US2002066025 ; | [AP]JP2002099283 ; | [XE]JP2002156979 | Examination | US3435130 | WO0008909 |