EP1362013 - SOLARIZATION STABLE BOROSILICATE GLASS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.12.2011 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schott AG Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | [2004/42] |
Former [2003/47] | For:AT
BE
CH
CY
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
LI
Schott Glas Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | ||
For:GB
IE
Carl Zeiss Stiftung Trading as Schott Glaswerke Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAUMANN, Karin Gutenbergstrasse 19 55270 Ober-Olm / DE | 02 /
RITTER, Simone Gallusgasse 13 55116 Mainz / DE | 03 /
OTT, Franz Glaswerk 30 95666 Mitterteich / DE | 04 /
STAPPEN, Herbert Weserstrasse 7 55296 Harxheim / DE | [2003/47] | Application number, filing date | 02732444.1 | 20.02.2002 | [2003/47] | WO2002EP01748 | Priority number, date | DE2001108992 | 23.02.2001 Original published format: DE 10108992 | [2003/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02081394 | Date: | 17.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1362013 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1362013 | Date: | 02.02.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C03C3/091 | [2003/47] | CPC: |
C03C3/091 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2011/05] |
Former [2003/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SOLARISATIONSSTABILES BOROSILICATGLAS UND SEINE VERWENDUNGEN | [2003/47] | English: | SOLARIZATION STABLE BOROSILICATE GLASS AND USES THEREOF | [2003/47] | French: | VERRE BOROSILICATE STABLE A LA SOLARISATION ET SES UTILISATIONS | [2003/47] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/47] | 18.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.02.2011 | DK | 02.02.2011 | FI | 02.02.2011 | IE | 02.02.2011 | NL | 02.02.2011 | SE | 02.02.2011 | TR | 02.02.2011 | AT | 20.02.2011 | LU | 20.02.2011 | BE | 28.02.2011 | CH | 28.02.2011 | LI | 28.02.2011 | MC | 28.02.2011 | GB | 02.05.2011 | GR | 03.05.2011 | ES | 13.05.2011 | PT | 02.06.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/25] | CY | 02.02.2011 | |
DK | 02.02.2011 | ||
FI | 02.02.2011 | ||
IE | 02.02.2011 | ||
NL | 02.02.2011 | ||
SE | 02.02.2011 | ||
AT | 20.02.2011 | ||
LU | 20.02.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
GB | 02.05.2011 | ||
GR | 03.05.2011 | ||
ES | 13.05.2011 | ||
PT | 02.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 02.02.2011 | |
DK | 02.02.2011 | ||
FI | 02.02.2011 | ||
IE | 02.02.2011 | ||
NL | 02.02.2011 | ||
SE | 02.02.2011 | ||
AT | 20.02.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
GB | 02.05.2011 | ||
GR | 03.05.2011 | ||
ES | 13.05.2011 | ||
PT | 02.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/30] | CY | 02.02.2011 | |
DK | 02.02.2011 | ||
FI | 02.02.2011 | ||
IE | 02.02.2011 | ||
NL | 02.02.2011 | ||
SE | 02.02.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
GB | 02.05.2011 | ||
GR | 03.05.2011 | ||
ES | 13.05.2011 | ||
PT | 02.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | CY | 02.02.2011 | |
DK | 02.02.2011 | ||
FI | 02.02.2011 | ||
IE | 02.02.2011 | ||
NL | 02.02.2011 | ||
SE | 02.02.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
GR | 03.05.2011 | ||
ES | 13.05.2011 | ||
PT | 02.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 02.02.2011 | |
DK | 02.02.2011 | ||
FI | 02.02.2011 | ||
IE | 02.02.2011 | ||
NL | 02.02.2011 | ||
SE | 02.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
GR | 03.05.2011 | ||
ES | 13.05.2011 | ||
PT | 02.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | CY | 02.02.2011 | |
FI | 02.02.2011 | ||
NL | 02.02.2011 | ||
SE | 02.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
GR | 03.05.2011 | ||
ES | 13.05.2011 | ||
PT | 02.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/39] | CY | 02.02.2011 | |
FI | 02.02.2011 | ||
NL | 02.02.2011 | ||
SE | 02.02.2011 | ||
GR | 03.05.2011 | ||
ES | 13.05.2011 | ||
PT | 02.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 02.02.2011 | |
FI | 02.02.2011 | ||
SE | 02.02.2011 | ||
GR | 03.05.2011 | ||
ES | 13.05.2011 | ||
PT | 02.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | SE | 02.02.2011 | |
GR | 03.05.2011 | ||
ES | 13.05.2011 | ||
PT | 02.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [DX]JPH0812369 ; | [DA]JPH1036135 ; | [A]DE4306004 (HORST HANS JUERGEN [DE]) [A] 1-12 * example -; claim - *; | [PX]EP1178020 (NIPPON ELECTRIC GLASS CO [JP]) [PX] 1-12 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009]; example - * * paragraph [0041] * | [DX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960531), vol. 1996, no. 05, & JP08012369 A 19960116 (TOSHIBA GLASS CO LTD) [DX] 1-8,12 * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 1998, no. 06, & JP10036135 A 19980210 (TOSHIBA GLASS CO LTD) [DA] 1-12 * abstract * | Examination | JPH0656467 | by applicant | JPH0812369 | EP0735007 | DE19545422 | JPH1036135 | US5994248 |