EP1390329 - PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING MICROCRYSTALLINE PARAFFIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/09] | MICROCRYSTALLINE PARAFFIN- | ||
[2012/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sasol Wax GmbH Worthdamm 13-27 20457 Hamburg / DE | [2004/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATTHÄI, Michael Matthias-Claudius-Str. 57 24558 Henstedt-Ulzburg / DE | 02 /
HILDEBRAND, Günter Breitscheidstrasse 12 06729 Rehmsdorf / DE | 03 /
SCHULZE-TRAUTMANN, Helmuth Appuhnstr. 18 22609 Hamburg / DE | 04 /
BUTZ, Thorsten Hohenwischer Str. 145 21129 Hamburg / DE | [2004/09] | Representative(s) | Müller, Enno, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Yale-Allee 26 42329 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Müller, Enno, et al RIEDER & PARTNER Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Corneliusstrasse 45 42329 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [2004/09] | Müller, Enno, Dipl.-Ing., et al Rieder & Partner Anwaltskanzlei Corneliusstrasse 45 42329 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 02732741.0 | 31.05.2002 | [2004/09] | WO2002EP05970 | Priority number, date | DE20011026516 | 30.05.2001 Original published format: DE 10126516 | [2004/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02096842 | Date: | 05.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1390329 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1390329 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C10G45/64 | [2012/44] | CPC: |
C10G45/64 (EP,US);
C10G2300/1022 (EP,US);
Y10S208/95 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/09] | C07C4/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/09] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES MIKROKRISTALLINEN PARAFFINS | [2012/44] | English: | PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING MICROCRYSTALLINE PARAFFIN | [2012/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRODUCTION DE PARAFFINE MICROCRISTALLINE | [2012/44] |
Former [2004/09] | MIKROKRISTALLINES PARAFFIN | ||
Former [2004/09] | MICROCRYSTALLINE PARAFFIN- | ||
Former [2004/09] | PARAFFINE MICROCRISTALLINE | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/09] | 25.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.10.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 10.04.2013 | DK | 10.04.2013 | FI | 10.04.2013 | MC | 10.04.2013 | SE | 10.04.2013 | AT | 31.05.2013 | CH | 31.05.2013 | IE | 31.05.2013 | LI | 31.05.2013 | LU | 31.05.2013 | GR | 11.07.2013 | PT | 12.08.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2014/37] | CY | 10.04.2013 | |
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
AT | 31.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
IE | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 10.04.2013 | |
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
IE | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 10.04.2013 | |
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | CY | 10.04.2013 | |
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 10.04.2013 | |
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 10.04.2013 | |
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | PT | 12.08.2013 | Cited in | International search | [PX]WO0174969 (EXXONMOBIL RES & ENG CO [US]) [PX] 1-20 * page 2, paragraph 1; claims 1-19; tables 1,2 * * page 5, paragraph 1 * * page 6, paragraph 2 * * page 7, paragraph 2 * * page 8, paragraph 2 *; | [XY]EP0435619 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [X] 1-5 * claims 6-19 * * claims 1-6; tables 3,5 * [Y] 6-20; | [Y]US4419220 (LAPIERRE RENE B [US], et al) [Y] 6-19 * page 2, paragraphs 1,2; examples 1-3 *; | [Y]US5904834 (ANSORGE JOACHIM [NL], et al) [Y] 20 * examples 1,2; claim 1 * | by applicant | DE69418388T | DE69515959T | DE3872851T |