EP1390401 - PLASMODIUM FALCIPARUM ANTIGENS AND VACCINE AND DIAGNOSTIC USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.04.2012 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUT PASTEUR 25-28, rue du Docteur Roux 75724 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/09] | For all designated states INSTITUT PASTEUR 25-28, rue du Docteur Roux 75724 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DRUILHE, Pierre 26, rue Lecourbe F-75015 Paris / FR | 02 /
GRÜNER, Anne-Charlotte 142 rue Marcadet F-75018 Paris / FR | [2004/09] | Representative(s) | Desaix, Anne, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/09] | Desaix, Anne, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A. 3, rue Chauveau-Lagarde 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02732872.3 | 15.05.2002 | [2004/09] | WO2002FR01637 | Priority number, date | CA20012345206 | 16.05.2001 Original published format: CA 2345206 | CA20012346968 | 23.05.2001 Original published format: CA 2346968 | [2004/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02092628 | Date: | 21.11.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1390401 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/445 | [2004/09] | CPC: |
C07K14/445 (EP,US);
A61P33/06 (EP);
A61K2039/52 (EP,US);
A61K2039/57 (EP,US);
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTIGENE VON PLASMODIUM FALCIPARUM UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS IMPFSTOFF UND ZUR DIAGNOSE | [2004/09] | English: | PLASMODIUM FALCIPARUM ANTIGENS AND VACCINE AND DIAGNOSTIC USES THEREOF | [2004/09] | French: | ANTIGENES DE PLASMODIUM FALCIPARUM ET LEURS APPLICATIONS VACCINALES ET DIAGNOSTIQUES | [2004/09] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/09] | 28.02.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/21] | 09.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0025728 (HOFFMAN STEPHEN [US], et al) [X] 1-9,15-18,20,23,29,30,34-36,38,39 * abstract * * page 2, line 2 * * page 12, lines 9-15 * * page 6, line 21; table 2 *; | [DX]US6191270 (DRUILHE PIERRE [FR], et al) [DX] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 67; examples 2,8 *; | [DXY] - DAUBERSIES PIERRE ET AL, "Protection against Plasmodium falciparum malaria in chimpanzees by immunization with the conserved pre-erythrocytic liver-stage antigen 3", NATURE MEDICINE, NATURE AMERICA, NEW YORK, US, (200011), vol. 6, no. 11, ISSN 1078-8956, pages 1258 - 1263, XP002213662 [DX] 1 * abstract * * page 1260, column G, paragraph 2 - page 1261, column G, paragraph 1 * [Y] 1 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/81366 | [Y] - BENMOHAMED L ET AL, "High immunogenicity in chimpanzees of peptides and lipopeptides derived from four new Plasmodium falciparum pre-erythrocytic molecules", VACCINE, BUTTERWORTH SCIENTIFIC. GUILDFORD, GB, (200006), vol. 18, no. 25, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 2843 - 2855, XP004203575 [Y] 1 * page 2849, column R, paragraph 2 - page 2849, column L, paragraph 1; figure 2 * * page 2853, column R, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0264-410X(00)00068-2 | [X] - GARDNER M J ET AL, "CHROMOSOME 2 SEQUENCE OF THE HUMAN MALARIA PARASITE PLASMODIUM FALCIPARUM", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE,, US, (19981106), vol. 282, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1126 - 1132, XP002907181 [X] 1-9,15-18 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.282.5391.1126 | [ ] - EMBL, (19981109), URL: AE001376, XP002222214 [ ] * abstract * | [PX] - EMBL, (20011222), Database accession no. BM273600, XP002222215 [PX] 1-9,15-18 * abstract * |