EP1393222 - MESSAGING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.05.2011 [2011/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OLIVER, Adam, John, Justin 423 Lexington, Bow Quarter, Fairfield Road London, Greater London E3 2UF / GB | 02 /
DANCE, Philip, John 4 Cramner House, Maybush Lane Felixstowe, Suffolk IP11 7NA / GB | [2004/10] | Representative(s) | Lidbetter, Timothy Guy Edwin, et al BT Intellectual Property Department Ground Floor BT Faraday Building 1 Knightrider Street London EC4V 5BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Lidbetter, Timothy Guy Edwin, et al BT Group Legal Intellectual Property Department PP C5A, BT Centre 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | ||
Former [2004/10] | Lidbetter, Timothy Guy Edwin, et al British Telecommunications PLC, BT Group Legal Services, Int. Prop. Dep., 8th Floor, 120 Holborn London EC1N 2TE / GB | Application number, filing date | 02732897.0 | 17.05.2002 | [2004/10] | WO2002GB02338 | Priority number, date | EP20010304982 | 07.06.2001 Original published format: EP 01304982 | [2004/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02099709 | Date: | 12.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1393222 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2004/10] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06311 (EP,US);
G06Q10/109 (EP,US);
G06Q10/1097 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/10] | Title | German: | NACHRICHTENSYSTEM | [2004/10] | English: | MESSAGING SYSTEM | [2004/10] | French: | SYSTEME DE MESSAGERIE | [2004/10] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 25.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/20] | 11.04.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.06.2011 | 23.06.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1091311 (FIRST HOP OY [FI]) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [X]US5835376 (SMITH CHRIS C [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * column 2, line 49 - line 62 * * column 4, line 45 - line 65 *; | [A]US5926524 (TAYLOR DON W [US]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * | Examination | WO0016203 |