EP1405216 - SELECTION OF AN ITEM OF MUSIC BASED ON ACCESS STATISTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.06.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2007 | Refusal of application | published on 04.07.2007 [2007/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/15] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUIL, Vincentius, P. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2004/15] | Representative(s) | van der Veer, Johannis Leendert, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/32] | van der Veer, Johannis Leendert, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2004/15] | Groenendaal, Antonius Wilhelmus Maria Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 02733016.6 | 21.05.2002 | [2004/15] | WO2002IB01791 | Priority number, date | EP20010202019 | 23.05.2001 Original published format: EP 01202019 | [2004/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02095611 | Date: | 28.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1405216 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2004/15] | CPC: |
G11B27/002 (EP,US);
G11B20/10 (KR);
G06Q30/0601 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/34 (EP,US);
G11B27/36 (EP,US);
G11B20/00086 (EP,US);
G11B2220/216 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2545 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/15] | Title | German: | AUSWAHL EINES MUSIKSTÜCKS AUF BASIS VON ZUGRIFFSSTATISTIKEN | [2004/15] | English: | SELECTION OF AN ITEM OF MUSIC BASED ON ACCESS STATISTICS | [2004/15] | French: | SELECTION D'UN ARTICLE | [2004/15] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 18.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/27] | 16.02.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 26.02.2007 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0872844 (THOMSON MULTIMEDIA SA [FR]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]JPH04221489 ; | [X]US6118450 (PROEHL ANDREW M [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]US6192340 (ABECASSIS MAX [US]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2030754 (NSM APPARATEBAU GMBH KG) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US5969283 (LOONEY BRIAN M [US], et al) [A] * abstract *; | [A]WO0054187 (ROCK COM INC [US]) [A] * page 22, line 17 - page 23, line 8 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921211), vol. 016, no. 571, Database accession no. (P - 1459), & JP04221489 A 19920811 (YAMAHA CORP) [X] 1-15 * abstract * |