EP1397857 - CIRCUIT CONFIGURATION COMPRISING A CONTROL LOOP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.04.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
CH
CY
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | [2013/39] |
Former [2009/47] | For:AT
BE
CH
CY
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [2004/12] | For:AT
BE
CH
CY
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
LI
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN BODEGRAVEN, Tijmen, C. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
ELFERICH, Reinhold Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2004/12] | Representative(s) | Verweij, Petronella Daniëlle, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/46] | Verweij, Petronella Danielle, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2004/12] | Volmer, Georg, Dipl.-Ing. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH, Weisshausstrasse 2 52066 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 02733145.3 | 30.05.2002 | [2004/12] | WO2002IB02067 | Priority number, date | DE2001126925 | 01.06.2001 Original published format: DE 10126925 | [2004/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02097958 | Date: | 05.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1397857 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/337 | [2004/12] | CPC: |
H02M3/33507 (EP,US);
H02M1/0012 (EP,US);
Y02B70/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/12] | Title | German: | SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG MIT EINER REGELSCHALTUNG | [2004/12] | English: | CIRCUIT CONFIGURATION COMPRISING A CONTROL LOOP | [2004/12] | French: | CIRCUIT COMPORTANT UN CIRCUIT DE REGULATION | [2004/12] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/31] | 11.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/20] | 07.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.05.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4578630 (GROSCH JAMES T [US]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * figure 1 * * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 26 *; | [X]US6212079 (BALAKRISHNAN BALU [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 5, line 1 - line 9 * * column 5, line 58 - line 65 *; | [X]JPH10127047 ; | [A]US4941076 (DIAZ BONIFACIO [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 4, line 23 - line 40 * * column 6, line 66 - column 7, line 35 *; | [A]US4084103 (BURNS III WILLIAM WESLEY, et al) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 8 * * column 28, line 12 - line 29 * * column 39, line 34 - line 41 *; | [A]EP0512544 (TOKYO ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 2, line 13 - line 41 *; | [X]EP0883230 (VLT CORP [US]) [X] 1 * column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 29 *; | [A]WO9844622 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 2, line 23 - page 3, line 17 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 1998, no. 10, & JP10127047 A 19980515 (CANON INC.) [X] 1-10 * abstract * | by applicant | DE10122534 | US4578630 | US6212079 |