EP1407399 - METHOD OF PROVIDING AN ACCOUNT INFORMATION AND DEVICE FOR TRANSCRIBING OF DICTATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/16] | METHOD OF PROVIDING AN ACCOUNT INFORMATION AND METHOD OF AND DEVICE FOR TRANSCRIBING OF DICTATIONS | ||
[2008/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2004/16] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARTOSIK, Heinrich, F. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2004/16] | Representative(s) | Damen, Daniel Martijn, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/26] | Damen, Daniel Martijn, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2005/40] | van der Veer, Johannis Leendert, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2004/16] | Röggla, Harald, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards, Triesterstrasse 64 1101 Vienna / AT | Application number, filing date | 02733178.4 | 20.06.2002 | [2004/16] | WO2002IB02477 | Priority number, date | EP20010890203 | 05.07.2001 Original published format: EP 01890203 | [2004/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03005258 | Date: | 16.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1407399 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1407399 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00 | [2008/16] | CPC: |
G06Q10/10 (EP,US);
G10L15/26 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/16] | G06F17/60 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/16] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BEREITSTELLEN VON KONTOINFORMATION UND SYSTEM ZUM AUFSCHREIBEN VON DIKTIERTEM TEXT | [2008/16] | English: | METHOD OF PROVIDING AN ACCOUNT INFORMATION AND DEVICE FOR TRANSCRIBING OF DICTATIONS | [2008/16] | French: | PROCEDE DE FOURNITURE D'UNE INFORMATION DE COMPTE-RENDU ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSCRIPTION DE DICTEES | [2008/16] |
Former [2004/16] | VERFAHREN ZUM BEREITSTELLEN VON KONTOINFORMATION UND VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM AUFSCHREIBEN VON DIKTIERTEM TEXT | ||
Former [2004/16] | METHOD OF PROVIDING AN ACCOUNT INFORMATION AND METHOD OF AND DEVICE FOR TRANSCRIBING OF DICTATIONS | ||
Former [2004/16] | PROCEDE DE FOURNITURE D'UNE INFORMATION DE COMPTE-RENDU ET PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSCRIPTION DE DICTEES | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/26] | 31.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.09.2008 | BE | 03.09.2008 | CY | 03.09.2008 | DK | 03.09.2008 | FI | 03.09.2008 | IT | 03.09.2008 | NL | 03.09.2008 | TR | 03.09.2008 | SE | 03.12.2008 | GR | 04.12.2008 | ES | 14.12.2008 | PT | 03.02.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2010/47] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
BE | 03.09.2008 | ||
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IT | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
SE | 03.12.2008 | ||
GR | 04.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
BE | 03.09.2008 | ||
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IT | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
SE | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
BE | 03.09.2008 | ||
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IT | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
BE | 03.09.2008 | ||
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
BE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
BE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 03.09.2008 | |
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 03.09.2008 | |
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | NL | 03.09.2008 | |
ES | 14.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5806078 (HUG RICHARD A [US], et al) [A] 9,20 * abstract *; | [A]EP0932108 (ADOBE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 11-14,18,21-24,26* abstract *; | [DY]US6173259 (BIJL DAVID [GB], et al) [DY] 1,19 * abstract *; | [Y]US6185514 (SKINNER GARY R [US], et al) [Y] 1,19 * column 1, line 28 - line 34 * * column 1, line 41 - line 43 * * column 2, line 62 - line 68 * * column 3, line 50 - line 62 * * column 9, line 7 - line 15 * * column 16, line 38 - line 51 * | by applicant | US5806078 | US6173259 | US6185514 |