EP1406086 - SIGNAL DETECTING SENSOR PROVIDED WITH MULTI-ELECTRODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2009 | Change - representative | published on 20.01.2010 [2010/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | For all designated states The Ritsumeikan Trust 56-1, Tojiinkitamachi, Kita-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 603-8577 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/15] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
For all designated states The Ritsumeikan Trust 56-1, Tojiinkitamachi, Kita-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 603-8577 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKA, Hiroaki Hirakatagadenhiruzu, 3-10, Nakamiyakitamachi Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-1194 / JP | 02 /
OZAKI, Nobuhiko 342-6, Aoyamadai Ikoma-shi, Nara 630-0239 / JP | 03 /
SUGIHARA, Hirokazu 1-10-630, Ikuno Katano-shi, Osaka 576-0054 / JP | 04 /
KONISHI, Satoshi 1-16-4, Hiyoshidai Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-0112 / JP | [2004/15] | Representative(s) | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf International S.A. Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf International S.A. Avenue du Pailly 25 1220 Les Avanchets-Genève / CH | ||
Former [2004/15] | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf SA 25, Avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 02733327.7 | 05.06.2002 | [2004/15] | WO2002JP05569 | Priority number, date | JP20010170340 | 05.06.2001 Original published format: JP 2001170340 | [2004/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02099408 | Date: | 12.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1406086 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.12.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/30, G01N27/416, G01N33/483, C12M1/34, C12Q1/34 | [2004/15] | CPC: |
G01N33/48728 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SIGNALDETEKTIONSSENSOR MIT MEHRFACHELEKTRODE | [2004/15] | English: | SIGNAL DETECTING SENSOR PROVIDED WITH MULTI-ELECTRODE | [2004/15] | French: | CAPTEUR DE DETECTION DE SIGNAUX POURVU DE MULTIPLES ELECTRODES | [2004/15] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2003 | Translation filed | 23.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2003 | Search fee paid | 23.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 23.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 12.11.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2007 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19948473 (NMI UNIV TUEBINGEN [DE], et al) [X] 1-17 * abstract ** column 7, line 64 - column 9, line 39; figures 1,2 * | International search | [A]JPH0678889 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH06296595 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]JPH08122326 (FUJITSU LTD); | [A]JPH09289886 (SHIMADZU CORP); | [A]WO9928037 (MICRONAS INTERMETALL GMBH [DE], et al); | [A]JPH11187865 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]WO9964559 (HAENNI CLAUDE [CH], et al); | [A] - HIROKAZU SUGIHARA, YASUSHI KOBAYASHI, MAKOTO TAKETANI, "Saibo den'i sokutei system oyobi daino hishitsu hattatsu katei kenkyu heno oyo", NATIONAL TECHNICAL REPORT, (1996), vol. 42, no. 2, pages 112 - 119, XP002955024 |