EP1400202 - NUCLEAR MAGNETIC RESONANCE DIAGNOSING DEVICE AND DIAGNOSING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR, GB | published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HITACHI MEDICAL CORPORATION 1-14, Uchikanda-1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0047 / JP | [2013/47] |
Former [2004/13] | For all designated states Hitachi Medical Corporation 1-14, Uchikanda-1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0047 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAMIMURA, Seiji, @c/o Design Center HITACHI, LTD 280, Higashikoigakubo 1-chome Kokubunji-shi, Tokyo 185-8601 / JP | 02 /
FUKAMI, Ryosuke, @c/o Design Center HITACHI, LTD 280, Higashikoigakubo 1-chome Kokubunji-shi, Tokyo 185-8601 / JP | 03 /
TAKEKOSHI, Isamu, @c/o Design Center HITACHI, LTD 280, Higashikoigakubo 1-chome Kokubunji-shi, Tokyo 185-8601 / JP | 04 /
IWASAKI, Masakatsu, @c/o Design Center HITACHI, LTD 280, Higashikoigakubo 1-chome Kokubunji-shi, Tokyo 185-8601 / JP | 05 /
YOSHINO, Hitoshi, @c/o HITACHI MEDICAL CORPORATION 1-14, Uchikanda 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0047 / JP | 06 /
MAEDA, Tsuneo, @c/o HITACHI MEDICAL CORPORATION 1-14, Uchikanda 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0047 / JP | [2013/47] |
Former [2004/13] | 01 /
KAMIMURA, Seiji, c/o Design Center HITACHI, LTD 280, Higashikoigakubo 1-chome Kokubunji-shi, Tokyo 185-8601 / JP | ||
02 /
FUKAMI, Ryosuke, c/o Design Center HITACHI, LTD 280, Higashikoigakubo 1-chome Kokubunji-shi, Tokyo 185-8601 / JP | |||
03 /
TAKEKOSHI, Isamu, c/o Design Center HITACHI, LTD 280, Higashikoigakubo 1-chome Kokubunji-shi, Tokyo 185-8601 / JP | |||
04 /
IWASAKI, Masakatsu, c/o Design Center HITACHI, LTD 280, Higashikoigakubo 1-chome Kokubunji-shi, Tokyo 185-8601 / JP | |||
05 /
YOSHINO, Hitoshi, c/o HITACHI MEDICAL CORPORATION 1-14, Uchikanda 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0047 / JP | |||
06 /
MAEDA, Tsuneo, c/o HITACHI MEDICAL CORPORATION 1-14, Uchikanda 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0047 / JP | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/47] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/13] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02733503.3 | 17.06.2002 | [2004/13] | WO2002JP06029 | Priority number, date | JP20010196528 | 28.06.2001 Original published format: JP 2001196528 | [2004/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03001999 | Date: | 09.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1400202 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1400202 | Date: | 20.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.01.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/055, G01R33/48, A61B6/03 | [2004/13] | CPC: |
G01R33/3806 (EP,US);
A61B5/055 (EP,US);
A61B5/704 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2013/47] |
Former [2004/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | NMR-DIAGNOSEVORRICHTUNG UND DIAGNOSESYSTEM | [2004/13] | English: | NUCLEAR MAGNETIC RESONANCE DIAGNOSING DEVICE AND DIAGNOSING SYSTEM | [2004/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET SYSTEME DE DIAGNOSTIC PAR RMN | [2004/13] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2003 | Translation filed | 14.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2004 | Search fee paid | 14.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 14.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/13] | 11.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.02.2008 | Opposition(s) | 21.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 20.11.2013 | GB | 17.06.2014 | FR | 30.06.2014 | [2015/24] |
Former [2014/22] | NL | 20.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH11104109 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990730), vol. 1999, no. 09, & JP11104109 A 19990420 (SHIN ETSU CHEM CO LTD) [X] 1-8 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPS5819240 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JPH09266893 (HITACHI MEDICAL CORP); | [Y]JPH09299352 (HITACHI MEDICAL CORP); | [A]JPH10127604 (TOSHIBA AMERICA MRI INC); | [Y]JPH1128199 (HITACHI MEDICAL CORP); | [Y]JPH11104109 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO); | [Y]JPH11188018 (SIEMENS AG); | [XP]JP2002017708 (HITACHI MEDICAL CORP) |