EP1494776 - METHODS OF IMPROVING CENTRIFUGAL FILTRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.06.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.07.2013 [2013/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VIRGINIA TECH INTELLECTUAL PROPERTIES, INC. 1872 Pratt Drive Blacksburg, VA 24060 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/27] | For all designated states Virginia Tech Intellectual Properties, Inc. 1872 Pratt Drive Blacksburg, VA 24060 / US | ||
Former [2005/02] | For all designated states Yoon, Roe-Hoan 2909 Wakefield Drive Blacksburg, VA 24060 / US | ||
For all designated states Asmatulu, Ramazan 907 Mason Drive Blacksburg, VA 24060 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/02] | Representative(s) | f & e patent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/25] | polypatent BGL Sattlerweg 14 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [2013/22] | polypatent BGL Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [2012/02] | Polypatent Postfach 10 04 11 51404 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [2010/02] | Polypatent Postfach 11 07 51482 Overath / DE | ||
Former [2005/48] | Kierdorf, Theodor Intecpatent Postfach 40 01 53 51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [2005/02] | Kierdorf, Theodor, Dipl.-Ing. Lippert, Stachow & Partner Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 02733969.6 | 12.04.2002 | [2005/02] | WO2002US11318 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03086571 | Date: | 23.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1494776 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B01D17/038, B01D35/01, B04B3/00 | [2005/02] | CPC: |
F26B5/14 (EP,US);
B04B15/08 (EP,US);
B04B15/12 (EP,US);
B04B3/00 (EP,US);
F26B21/10 (EP,US);
F26B5/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2005/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG VON ZENTRIFUGALFILTRATION | [2005/02] | English: | METHODS OF IMPROVING CENTRIFUGAL FILTRATION | [2005/02] | French: | PROCEDES POUR AMELIORER UNE FILTRATION CENTRIFUGE | [2005/02] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2004 | Search fee paid | 09.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/02] | 13.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 13.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/30] | 17.06.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.07.2013 | 17.07.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.12.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO8905193 (HEINKEL IND ZENTRIFUGEN [DE]) [X] 1-12 * page 2, lines 8-10,22-25 * * page 6, lines 16-23 * * page 7, lines 6-9 * * page 10, lines 10-13; figures 1,2; claims 1,11 * [A] 13-18; | [X]US4997575 (HULTSCH GUENTHER [DE]) [X] 1-18 * column 1, lines 41-46; claims 1,20 * * column 2, lines 33-41; figure 1 *; | [XA]DE4417310 (HEINKEL IND ZENTRIFUGEN [DE]) [X] 1-12 * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 8; claim 1 * [A] 13-18; | [XA]WO9905483 (HEINKEL IND ZENTRIFUGEN [DE], et al) [X] 1-12 * page 2, lines 6-11 * * page 7, lines 5-16 *[A] 13-18 | International search | [X]US4997575 (HULTSCH GUENTHER [DE]) | by applicant | WO8905193 | US4997575 | DE4417310 | WO9905483 |