EP1401328 - REFERENCING OPTICAL CATHETERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.06.2010 [2010/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InfraReDx, Inc. 125 Cambridge Park Drive Cambridge, MA 02140 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/14] | For all designated states Infraredx, Inc. 125 Cambridge Park Drive Cambridge, MA 02140 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RYAN, S., Eric 274 Ash Street Hopkinton, MA 01748 / US | 02 /
BOUMA, Brett, E. 12 Monmouth Street Quincy, MA 02171 / US | 03 /
TEARNEY, Guillermo, J. 118 Kinnaird Street 3 Cambridge, MA 02139-2914 / US | 04 /
FURNISH, Simon 30 St. Mark's Place, 2D New York, NY 10003 / US | 05 /
TANG, Jing 15 Newman Way, Apt.22 Arlington, MA 02476 / US | 06 /
ZULUAGA, Andres 130 Bowdoin Street Boston, MA 02108 / US | [2007/32] |
Former [2004/18] | 01 /
RYAN, S., Eric 274 Ash Street Hopkinton, MA 01748 / US | ||
02 /
BOUMA, Brett, E. 12 Monmouth Street Quincy, MA 02171 / US | |||
03 /
TEARNEY, Guillermo, J. 118 Kinnaird Street 3 Cambridge, MA 02139-2914 / US | |||
04 /
FURNISH, Simon 30 St. Mark's Place, #2D New York, NY 10003 / US | |||
05 /
TANG, Jing 15 Newman Way, Apt.22 Arlington, MA 02476 / US | |||
06 /
ZULUAGA, Andres 130 Bowdoin Street Boston, MA 02108 / US | |||
Former [2004/14] | 01 /
RYAN, S., Eric 274 Ash Street Hopkinton, MA 01748 / US | ||
02 /
BOUMA, Brett, E. 12 Monmouth Street Quincy, MA 02171 / US | |||
03 /
TEARNEY, Guillermo, J. 118 Kinnaird Street 3 Cambridge, MA 02139-2914 / US | |||
04 /
FURNISH, Simon Apt.2, 124 North Clay Street Louisville, KY 40202-1057 / US | |||
05 /
TANG, Jing 49 Hooker Street, Apt. 3 Allston, MA 02134 / US | |||
06 /
ZULUAGA, Andres 130 Bowdoin Street Boston, MA 02108 / US | Representative(s) | Hutchinson, Glenn Stanley HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/14] | Hutchinson, Glenn Stanley Harrison Goddard Foote, Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02734338.3 | 10.05.2002 | [2004/14] | WO2002US14790 | Priority number, date | US20010871759 | 31.05.2001 Original published format: US 871759 | [2004/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02098478 | Date: | 12.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1401328 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.02.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, G01N21/21 | [2006/14] | CPC: |
A61B5/0084 (EP,US);
A61B5/14535 (EP,US);
G01N21/4785 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0233 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/14] | A61B5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHE BEZUGSKATHETER | [2004/14] | English: | REFERENCING OPTICAL CATHETERS | [2004/14] | French: | CATHETERS OPTIQUES DE REFERENCAGE | [2004/14] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2003 | Search fee paid | 23.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/14] | 23.02.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/22] | 14.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2009 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4469442 (REICH FREDERICH R [US]) [X] 7-10 * abstract * * column 2, line 18 - line 36 * * column 3, line 27 - column 5, line 32 *; | [A]EP0220534 (OXIMETRIX [US]) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0271304 (SPECTRAMED INC [US]) [X] 1-4,11-16 * abstract * * column 1, line 33 - line 59 *; | [XA]EP0366840 (BAXTER INT [US]) [X] 1-4,11-13,16 * abstract * * column 4, line 1 - column 9, line 35 * [A] 5,6; | [A]US5104392 (KITTRELL CARTER [US], et al) [A] 7-10* the whole document *; | [A]US5305744 (PFEIFFER ULRICH [DE], et al) [A] 1,11 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US4050450 (POLANYI MICHAEL LAJOS, et al); | [A]US4904085 (SPILLMAN JR WILLIAM B [US], et al); | [A]US5365925 (LEE WYLIE I [US]) |