EP1399635 - WINDOW COVERING ADJUSTMENT APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2006 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zipshade Industrial (B.V.I) Corp. 21307 Lasso Drive Diamond Bar, CA 91765-3538 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/13] | For all designated states Zipshade Industrial (B.V.I) Corp. 21307 Lasso Drive DiamondBar, CA 91765 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHENG, Li-Ming 215 Jeou Ju 1st Road Sun Ming Dist., Kaohsiung / TW | 02 /
WU, Lawrence S. 19142 Hastings Street Rowland Heights, CA 91748 / US | [2004/13] | Representative(s) | Ruschke, Hans Edvard, et al Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen Patentanwälte Patent Attorney (UK) PartG mbB Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard, et al RUSCHKE HARTMANN MADGWICK & SEIDE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/13] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Ruschke Hartmann Becker Pienzenauerstrasse 2 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02734468.8 | 17.05.2002 | [2004/13] | WO2002US15753 | Priority number, date | US20010871361 | 30.05.2001 Original published format: US 871361 | [2004/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02097227 | Date: | 05.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1399635 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.07.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/262, E06B9/32 | [2004/35] | CPC: |
E06B9/262 (EP,US);
E06B2009/2625 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/13] | E06B1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR EINSTELLUNG EINER FENSTERABDECKUNG | [2004/13] | English: | WINDOW COVERING ADJUSTMENT APPARATUS AND METHOD | [2004/13] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL D'AJUSTEMENT D'UN COUVRE-FENETRE | [2004/13] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2003 | Search fee paid | 28.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/13] | 01.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/25] | 25.01.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2546534 (ZNIDARSIC LOUIS J) [X] 20,21 * the whole document * [Y] 10-16,18,19; | [Y]US3465806 (SULKES EMANUEL M) [Y] 1-16,18,19 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6131640 (JUDKINS REN [US]) [Y] 1-9* the whole document * | International search | [X]US2546534 (ZNIDARSIC LOUIS J); | [Y]US3465806 (SULKES EMANUEL M) |