EP1405198 - SCALABLE, RELIABLE SESSION INITIATION PROTOCOL (SIP) SIGNALING ROUTING NODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tekelec, Inc. 5200 Paramount Parkway Morrisville, NC 27560 / US | [2012/41] |
Former [2012/40] | For all designated states Tekelec Global Inc. 5200 Paramount Parkway Morrisville, NC 27560 / US | ||
Former [2004/15] | For all designated states Tekelec 26580 West Agoura Road Calabasas, CA 91302 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STERNAGLE, Richard, Henry 10201 Sorrills Creek Lane Raleigh, NC 27614 / US | [2004/15] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/15] | Charles, Glyndwr Reinhard-Skuhra-Weise & Partner, Patentanwälte, Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02734585.9 | 30.05.2002 | [2004/15] | WO2002US16915 | Priority number, date | US20010867879 | 30.05.2001 Original published format: US 867879 | [2004/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02097653 | Date: | 05.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1405198 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1405198 | Date: | 18.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.12.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, G06F15/16, H04L12/56 | [2011/48] | CPC: |
H04L45/24 (EP,US);
H04L65/1104 (EP,US);
H04L45/38 (EP,US);
H04L47/122 (EP,US);
H04L47/125 (EP,US);
H04L47/26 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/15] | G06F15/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/15] | Title | German: | ZEICHENGABE-ROUTING-KNOTEN FÜR EIN SKALIERBARES ZUVERLÄSSIGES SITZUNGSEINLEITUNGSPROTOKOLL (SIP) | [2004/15] | English: | SCALABLE, RELIABLE SESSION INITIATION PROTOCOL (SIP) SIGNALING ROUTING NODE | [2004/15] | French: | NOEUD DE ROUTAGE DE SIGNALISATION DU PROTOCOLE D'INITIATION DE SESSION (SIP) EXTENSIBLE ET FIABLE | [2004/15] | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2003 | Search fee paid | 29.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 29.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.08.2007 | Opposition(s) | 19.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.07.2012 | BE | 18.07.2012 | CY | 18.07.2012 | DK | 18.07.2012 | FI | 18.07.2012 | IT | 18.07.2012 | MC | 18.07.2012 | NL | 18.07.2012 | SE | 18.07.2012 | TR | 18.07.2012 | GR | 19.10.2012 | ES | 29.10.2012 | PT | 19.11.2012 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/03] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
MC | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 18.07.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0069140 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 18-23,29-37 * page 15 - page 16 * * page 21 - page 32 *; | [A]WO0113228 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-37 * page 4 - page 6 * * page 11 - page 14 *; | [X] - WANG H J ET AL, "A signaling system using lightweight call sessions", INFOCOM 2000. NINETEENTH ANNUAL JOINT CONFERENCE OF THE IEEE COMPUTER AND COMMUNICATIONS SOCIETIES. PROCEEDINGS. IEEE TEL AVIV, ISRAEL 26-30 MARCH 2000, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (20000326), vol. 2, ISBN 0-7803-5880-5, pages 697 - 706, XP010376159 [X] 1-37 * page 697 - page 705 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/INFCOM.2000.832244 | [A] - JONATHAN ROSENBERG, "SIP Proxies", INTERNET ARTICLE, VON Developers Conference, (200007), pages 1 - 31, URL: http://www.jdrosen.net/papers/devconf_spring2000_proxies.ppt, (20070709), XP002432835 [A] 1-37 * page 28 * | [A] - GRIBBLE S D ET AL, "The MultiSpace: an evolutionary platform for infrastructural services", PROCEEDINGS OF THE USENIX ANNUAL TECHNICAL CONFERENCE, (19990606), pages 157 - 170, XP002209077 [A] 1-37 * page 158 - page 165 * | [A] - WIESMANN M ET AL, "Understanding replication in databases and distributed systems", DISTRIBUTED COMPUTING SYSTEMS, 2000. PROCEEDINGS. 20TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON TAIPEI, TAIWAN 10-13 APRIL 2000, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (20000410), ISBN 0-7695-0601-1, pages 464 - 474, XP010379058 [A] 1,24 * page 466 - page 469 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICDCS.2000.840959 | International search | [AP]US6366577 (DONOVAN STEVEN R [US]); | [AP]US6385198 (OFEK YORAM [US], et al); | [AE]US6404746 (CAVE ELLIS K [US], et al); | [AE]US6421674 (YOAKUM JOHN H [US], et al) |