EP1393106 - OPTICAL FIBER FUSION SPLICE HAVING A CONTROLLED MODE FIELD DIAMETER EXPANSION MATCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SYKORA, Craig R. 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
ONSTOTT, James R. 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
ANDERSON, Mark T. 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
SCHARDT, Craig R. 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
DONALDS, Lawrence J. 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 06 /
CHIARELI, Alessandra O.P. 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2004/10] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/10] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02734598.2 | 29.05.2002 | [2004/10] | WO2002US17091 | Priority number, date | US20010294740P | 29.05.2001 Original published format: US 294740 P | [2004/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02097496 | Date: | 05.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1393106 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/255 | [2004/10] | CPC: |
G02B6/03655 (EP,US);
C03C13/046 (EP,US);
C03C23/0095 (EP,US);
C03C25/104 (EP,US);
C03C25/1065 (EP,US);
C03C25/608 (EP,US);
C03C3/06 (EP,US);
G02B6/03627 (EP,US);
G02B6/03633 (EP,US);
G02B6/0365 (EP,US);
G02B6/03694 (EP,US);
G02B6/2551 (EP,US);
H01S3/06708 (EP,US);
C03B2201/12 (EP,US);
C03B2201/28 (EP,US);
C03B2201/36 (EP,US);
C03B2203/22 (EP,US);
G02B6/02285 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHER FASERSPLEISS MIT KONTROLLIERTER ANPASSUNG DER AUSDEHNUNG VON MODENFELDDURCHMESSERN | [2004/10] | English: | OPTICAL FIBER FUSION SPLICE HAVING A CONTROLLED MODE FIELD DIAMETER EXPANSION MATCH | [2004/10] | French: | EPISSURE PAR FUSION DE FIBRE OPTIQUE PRESENTANT UNE ADAPTATION DE L'EXPANSION DE DIAMETRE DE CHAMP DE MODE CONTROLE | [2004/10] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 17.06.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5778129 (SHUKUNAMI NORIFUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1-17,19 * column 10, line 64 - column 12, line 42; figures 14-16 * * column 13, line 29 - line 31 *; | [A]EP0469792 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 1,17 * column 3, line 39 * * column 5, line 28 - line 40 *; | [A]EP0091738 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [A] 1,17 * page 5, line 5 - line 9 * | [A] - ONISHI M ET AL, "Dispersion compensating fibre with a high figure of merit of 250ps/nm/dB", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, IEE STEVENAGE, GB, (19940120), vol. 30, no. 2, ISSN 0013-5194, pages 161 - 163, XP006000106 [A] 1,17 * page 162, column R * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:19940113 |